EP1722421 - Floating integrated photodiode [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2013 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2013 [2013/24] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
GB
IT
STMICROELECTRONICS SA 29, Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roy, Francois 35, rue Fenouillères 38130 Seyssins / FR | 02 /
Tournier, Arnaud 39bis, rue Nicolas Chorier 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Zapalowicz, Francis Casalonga & Partners Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Zapalowicz, Francis Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Zapalowicz, Francis Bureau Casalonga & Josse Bayerstrasse 71/73 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06290735.7 | 09.05.2006 | [2006/46] | Priority number, date | FR20050004836 | 13.05.2005 Original published format: FR 0504836 | [2006/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1722421 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1722421 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
H01L27/1443 (EP,US);
H01L27/14609 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/52] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Integrierte massefreie Fotodiode | [2006/46] | English: | Floating integrated photodiode | [2006/46] | French: | Photodiode intégrée de type à substrat flottant | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 25.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 26.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/24] | 21.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2003188367 ; | [X]JP2001053260 ; | [A]US2004201047 (TAKAMURA TAKASHI [JP]) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0035] *; | [A]US2002024071 (KAWAJIRI KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0017] - [0019] - [0059]; figure 4a * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031105), vol. 2003, no. 11, & JP2003188367 A 20030704 (TOSHIBA CORP) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001053260 A 20010223 (SONY CORP) [X] 1,6,7 * abstract * | [DA] - MIIDA T ET AL, "A 1.5MPixel imager with localized hole modulation method", SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE, 2002. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. 2002 IEEE INTERNATIONAL FEB 3-7, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (2002), vol. 1, ISBN 0-7803-7335-9, pages 42 - 442, XP010585455 [DA] 1-7 * figures 2.5.1,2.5.2 * * column 1, paragraphs 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISSCC.2002.992929 |