EP1726219 - Process for preparing rillettes from roasted chicken [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.08.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUISSIER 42, Rue Rieussec 78220 Viroflay / FR | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cormier, André 3 Impasse de Bosquet 72190 Coulaines / FR | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Corizzi, Valérie, et al Cabinet ORES 36, rue de Saint Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Corizzi, Valérie, et al Cabinet ORES, 36, rue de Saint Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06290830.6 | 23.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | FR20050005368 | 27.05.2005 Original published format: FR 0505368 | [2006/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1726219 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1726219 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/315 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
A23L13/52 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Rilletes aus gebratenem Huhn | [2006/48] | English: | Process for preparing rillettes from roasted chicken | [2006/48] | French: | Procede de preparation de rillettes de poulet roti | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 18.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.10.2008 | CY | 08.10.2008 | CZ | 08.10.2008 | DK | 08.10.2008 | EE | 08.10.2008 | FI | 08.10.2008 | IE | 08.10.2008 | IT | 08.10.2008 | LT | 08.10.2008 | LV | 08.10.2008 | NL | 08.10.2008 | PL | 08.10.2008 | RO | 08.10.2008 | SI | 08.10.2008 | SK | 08.10.2008 | TR | 08.10.2008 | BG | 08.01.2009 | SE | 08.01.2009 | GR | 09.01.2009 | IS | 08.02.2009 | PT | 18.02.2009 | HU | 09.04.2009 | LU | 23.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
HU | 09.04.2009 | ||
LU | 23.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
LU | 23.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
GR | 09.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
CZ | 08.10.2008 | ||
DK | 08.10.2008 | ||
EE | 08.10.2008 | ||
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
IE | 08.10.2008 | ||
IT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
RO | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
SK | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
SE | 08.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 08.10.2008 | |
FI | 08.10.2008 | ||
LT | 08.10.2008 | ||
LV | 08.10.2008 | ||
NL | 08.10.2008 | ||
PL | 08.10.2008 | ||
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
BG | 08.01.2009 | ||
IS | 08.02.2009 | ||
PT | 18.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 08.10.2008 | |
SI | 08.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/17] | SI | 08.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH01171461 ; | [Y]US3285753 (SCHWALL DONALD V, et al) [Y] 1-11 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 53 * * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 48 * * claims 1-5 *; | [AD]GB1189670 (ARMOUR & CO [US]) [AD] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1293449 (SWIFT & CO [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US3709699 (HARTMAN R, et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, lines 25-27 * * column 2, lines 8-22 *; | [A]FR2208616 (CARRERE EMERY [FR]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [AD]GB2087210 (D & S FOOD PRODUCTS LTD) [AD] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]FR2570932 (LEHUGER GUY [FR]) [A] 1-11 * claim 4 *; | [Y]FR2596957 (LEHUGER GUY [FR]) [Y] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5431937 (KANDL JOHN R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891006), vol. 013, no. 447, Database accession no. (C - 642), & JP01171461 A 19890706 (MUNEHARU NAKANISHI) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | US3704135 | US2004067291 |