EP1779760 - Dust collecting apparatus of vacuum cleaner [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Gwangju Electronics Co., Ltd. 271, Oseon-dong, Gwangsan-gu Gwangju-city / KR | [2007/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeon, Kyoung-hui 452-1, Dongmun-dong Seosan-si Chungcheongnam-do / KR | [2007/18] | Representative(s) | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/18] | Blot, Philippe Robert Emile, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291178.9 | 20.07.2006 | [2007/18] | Priority number, date | KR20050102614 | 28.10.2005 Original published format: KR 20050102614 | [2007/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1779760 | Date: | 02.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1779760 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1779760 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/16 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
A47L9/1608 (EP,US);
A47L9/16 (KR);
A47L9/10 (KR);
A47L9/165 (EP,US);
A47L9/1658 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2009/14] |
Former [2007/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Staubsammelvorrichtung für einen Staubsauger | [2007/18] | English: | Dust collecting apparatus of vacuum cleaner | [2007/18] | French: | Dispositif collecteur de poussière pour un aspirateur | [2007/18] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/08] | 24.01.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.03.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US1759947 (LEE RALPH L) [X] 1 * page 1, line 79 - page 2, line 26; figure - * [A] 7; | [A]FR1094603 (FRANCOIS MARTELLIERE) [A] 1,2,7 * the whole document *; | [DA]CA2330801 (FANTOM TECH INC [CA]) [DA] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO0107168 (GBD CORP [CA], et al) [DA] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1726245 (SAMSUNG KWANGJU ELECTRONICS CO [KR]) [E] 1-11 * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0063]; figures 3,7,8 * | by applicant | US1759947 | WO0107168 | CA2330801 |