EP1918507 - Shaped charge comprising an acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For all designated states Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For all designated states Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For all designated states PRAD Research and Development N.V. De Ruyterkade 62 Willemstad, Curacao / AN | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | For all designated states Services Pétroliers Schlumberger 42, rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | |||
For all designated states Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71, Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | |||
For all designated states PRAD Research and Development N.V. De Ruyterkade 62 Willemstad, Curacao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saenger, Richard 15, rue de l'Epargne 92320 Chatillon / FR | 02 /
Wortelboer, Willehard 38 Allée du Tillet 78870 Bailly / FR | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Raybaud, Hélène Florence Anne Etudes & Productions Schlumberger Intellectual Property Law Department 1, rue Henri Becquerel B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/19] | Raybaud, Hélène F. A. Etudes & Productions Schlumberger 1, rue Henri Becquerel B.P. 202 92142 Clamart Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291699.4 | 31.10.2006 | [2008/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1918507 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E21B37/08, E21B43/117, F42B1/032 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
E21B43/117 (EP,US);
E21B37/08 (EP,US);
F42B1/032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/19] | Title | German: | Hohlladung enthaltend eine Säure | [2008/19] | English: | Shaped charge comprising an acid | [2008/19] | French: | Charge creuse comprenant un acide | [2008/19] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/33] | 26.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3054938 (MEDDICK LORRAIN D) [X] 1,3,8,9 * column 4, lines 58-70 * * figure 4 *; | [X]US3188955 (BROWN WILLIAM E) [X] 1,8,9 * column 4, lines 37-44 * * column 5, lines 56-75 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US3190219 (ALEXIS VENGHIATTIS) [A] 1,9 * column 2, lines 54-64 * * column 3, lines 7-18 * * column 3, line 68 - column 4, line 6 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US3762326 (EDGELL T, et al) [A] 1,9 * column 2, lines 28-41 * * claims 1,5,6 * * figures 1-4 * |