EP1793522 - Method and device for selecting spreading parameters of an OFDM-CDMA system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.02.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | [2007/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ktenas, Dimitri 23 ter rue de la Liberté 38600 Fontaine / FR | 02 /
Bouvier des Noes, Mathieu 3 rue Charreton 38600 Grenoble / FR | [2007/23] | Representative(s) | Rosenberg, Muriel Sylvie Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/23] | Rosenberg, Muriel Sylvie Santarelli, 14 avenue de la Grande Armée, B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291853.7 | 01.12.2006 | [2007/23] | Priority number, date | FR20050012311 | 05.12.2005 Original published format: FR 0512311 | [2007/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1793522 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1793522 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/02, H04L1/00 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
H04L5/0016 (EP,US);
H04L25/03159 (EP,US);
H04L27/2602 (EP,US);
H04L5/0039 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L25/0216 (EP,US);
H04L5/0062 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/23] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Auswahl von Spreizparametern eines OFDM-CDMA-Systems | [2007/23] | English: | Method and device for selecting spreading parameters of an OFDM-CDMA system | [2007/23] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de sélection des paramètres d'étalement d'un système OFDM-CDMA | [2007/23] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 13.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 05.12.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.04.2008 | CY | 09.04.2008 | CZ | 09.04.2008 | DK | 09.04.2008 | EE | 09.04.2008 | IE | 09.04.2008 | IT | 09.04.2008 | LT | 09.04.2008 | LV | 09.04.2008 | NL | 09.04.2008 | PL | 09.04.2008 | RO | 09.04.2008 | SI | 09.04.2008 | SK | 09.04.2008 | TR | 09.04.2008 | BG | 09.07.2008 | GR | 10.07.2008 | IS | 09.08.2008 | PT | 11.09.2008 | HU | 10.10.2008 | LU | 01.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | [2011/03] |
Former [2010/41] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
TR | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 11.09.2008 | ||
HU | 10.10.2008 | ||
LU | 01.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 11.09.2008 | ||
LU | 01.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CY | 09.04.2008 | ||
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 11.09.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/28] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
EE | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
RO | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
CZ | 09.04.2008 | ||
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LT | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
SK | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
DK | 09.04.2008 | ||
IE | 09.04.2008 | ||
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
IS | 09.08.2008 | ||
PT | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 09.04.2008 | |
LV | 09.04.2008 | ||
NL | 09.04.2008 | ||
PL | 09.04.2008 | ||
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
PT | 11.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | NL | 09.04.2008 | |
SI | 09.04.2008 | ||
BG | 09.07.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 09.04.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1503535 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-26 * paragraph [0079]; figure 10 * * paragraphs [0081] - [0089]; figures 11,12 *; | [AD] - MAEDA N ET AL, "Variable spreading factor-OFCDM with two dimensional spreading that prioritizes time domain spreading for forward link broadband wireless access", VTC 2003-SPRING. THE 57TH. IEEE SEMIANNUAL VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS. JEJU, KOREA, APRIL 22 - 25, 2003, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20030422), VOL. 1 OF 4. CONF. 57, ISBN 0-7803-7757-5, pages 127 - 132, XP002328610 [AD] 1-26 * abstract * * équations 1-4; pages 128-129; figures 1,2 * * page 131, column R, paragraph L - page 132, column L, paragraph F * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2003.1207516 | [A] - JALLON P ET AL, "Asymptotic analysis of the Multiuser MMSE Receiver for the downlink of a MC-CDMA System", VTC 2003-SPRING. THE 57TH. IEEE SEMIANNUAL VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE. PROCEEDINGS. JEJU, KOREA, APRIL 22 - 25, 2003, IEEE VEHICULAR TECHNOLGY CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (200304), VOL. 1 OF 4. CONF. 57, ISBN 0-7803-7757-5, pages 363 - 367, XP002311550 [A] 1-26 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2003.1207563 |