EP1936931 - Cable topology determination arrangement and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/26] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fossion, Marc Rue Sart Mallet 14 5140 Ligny / BE | 02 /
Duvivier, Michael Rue des Haies 67 6120 Nalinnes / BE | [2008/26] | Representative(s) | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel-Lucent Bell NV Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | Narmon, Gisèle Marie Thérèse, et al Alcatel-Lucent Bell NV Copernicuslaan 50 2018 Antwerpen / BE | ||
Former [2009/39] | BiiP cvba Culliganlaan 1B 1831 Diegem (Bruxelles) / BE | ||
Former [2008/26] | Plas, Axel Ivo Michel, et al Culliganlaan 1B 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 06291989.9 | 19.12.2006 | [2008/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1936931 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1936931 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/30, G01R31/11, H04B3/46 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
H04M3/306 (EP);
G01R31/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/26] | Title | German: | Kabeltopologiebestimmungsanordnung und -verfahren | [2008/26] | English: | Cable topology determination arrangement and method | [2008/26] | French: | Procédé et agencement de détermination de topologie de câble | [2008/26] | Examination procedure | 21.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 07.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.09.2010 | BE | 15.09.2010 | CY | 15.09.2010 | CZ | 15.09.2010 | DK | 15.09.2010 | EE | 15.09.2010 | FI | 15.09.2010 | IT | 15.09.2010 | LT | 15.09.2010 | LV | 15.09.2010 | NL | 15.09.2010 | PL | 15.09.2010 | RO | 15.09.2010 | SE | 15.09.2010 | SI | 15.09.2010 | SK | 15.09.2010 | TR | 15.09.2010 | BG | 15.12.2010 | GR | 16.12.2010 | IE | 19.12.2010 | LU | 19.12.2010 | ES | 26.12.2010 | CH | 31.12.2010 | LI | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | IS | 15.01.2011 | PT | 17.01.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
TR | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IE | 19.12.2010 | ||
LU | 19.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IE | 19.12.2010 | ||
LU | 19.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IE | 19.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
BG | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IE | 19.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IE | 19.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
CH | 31.12.2010 | ||
LI | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
DK | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
BE | 15.09.2010 | ||
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
IT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
NL | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
RO | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
ES | 26.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
PT | 17.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 15.09.2010 | ||
EE | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
SK | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
IS | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
CY | 15.09.2010 | ||
FI | 15.09.2010 | ||
LT | 15.09.2010 | ||
LV | 15.09.2010 | ||
PL | 15.09.2010 | ||
SE | 15.09.2010 | ||
SI | 15.09.2010 | ||
GR | 16.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 15.09.2010 | |
LT | 15.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1515850 (LIM CHING HWA) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 1 * * page 1, column 1, line 38 - page 1, column 2, line 88 ** page 3, column 2, line 101 - page 4, column 2, line 80 *; | [Y]EP1494037 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0028] * | Examination | US5481195 |