EP1840806 - Systems and method of managing an inventory of service resources [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.2008 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amadeus S.A.S. 485 Route du Pin Montard Sophia Antipolis 06410 Biot / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Amadeus s.a.s 485 Route du Pin Montard Sophia Antipolis 06410 Biot / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Viale, Valérie, Office Méditérranéen de brevets et de marques Cabinet Hautier, 20, rue de la Liberté 06000, NICE / FR | 02 /
Raufaste, Nathalie, Office Méditérranéen de brevets et de marques Cabinet Hautier, 20 rue de la Liberté 06000, NICE / FR | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Decobert, Jean-Pascal, et al Office Méditerranéen De Brevets d'Invention Cabinet Hautier 20, rue de la Liberté 06000 Nice / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Decobert, Jean-Pascal, et al Office Méditerranéen de Brevets d'Invention Cabinet Hautier 20, rue de la Liberté F-06000 Nice / FR | Application number, filing date | 06300290.1 | 28.03.2006 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840806 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G06Q10/02 (EP,US);
G06Q10/0637 (EP,US);
G06Q50/14 (EP,US);
G06Q99/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/24] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Systeme und Verfahren zur Verwaltung eines Bestands von Dienstressourcen | [2007/40] | English: | Systems and method of managing an inventory of service resources | [2007/40] | French: | Systèmes et procédé de gestion d'un inventaire de ressources de service | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/42] | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/42] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search |