EP1865647 - Application related resynchronization device and a method therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Defoort, Frank Rapenbergstraat 2 9150 Kruibeke-Bazel / BE | 02 /
Hublet, Christian Antwerpse Steenweg 39 9080 Lochristi / BE | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/50] | Schmidt, Werner Karl, et al Alcatel Lucent Intellectual Property & Standards 70430 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06300570.6 | 09.06.2006 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1865647 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1865647 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/02 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
H04L5/1438 (EP,US);
H04L7/02 (KR);
H04L5/02 (KR);
H04L5/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Title | German: | Anwendungsbezogene Resynchronisierungseinrichtung und ein dazugehöriges Verfahren | [2007/50] | English: | Application related resynchronization device and a method therefor | [2007/50] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de resynchronisation relative à l'application | [2007/50] | Examination procedure | 08.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 07.03.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2008 | BE | 30.07.2008 | CY | 30.07.2008 | CZ | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | EE | 30.07.2008 | FI | 30.07.2008 | LT | 30.07.2008 | LV | 30.07.2008 | PL | 30.07.2008 | RO | 30.07.2008 | SI | 30.07.2008 | SK | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | BG | 30.10.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | IS | 30.11.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | HU | 31.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
HU | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
IS | 30.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0905948 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 3 - page 3, paragraph 9 * * page 3, paragraph 14 - page 4, paragraph 19 * * page 4, paragraph 21 * * page 4, paragraph 23 - page 5, paragraph 24 * * page 5, paragraph 28 * * page 6, paragraph 44 * * claim 4 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6345071 (HAMDI RABAH S [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 5 * * column 5, line 40 - column 7, line 52 * * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 28 * * column 11, line 37 - column 13, line 58 * * column 14, line 28 - column 15, line 13 * * column 16, line 4 - line 40 * * column 17, line 31 - column 18, line 11 * * column 18, line 66 - column 19, line 24 * * figures 1-5,7,8 *; | [A]WO03041353 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * page 1, line 8 - line 10 * * page 1, line 26 - line 29 * * page 1, line 35 - page 2, line 7 * * page 2, line 12 - line 16 * * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 5 * * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 3 * * page 4, line 26 - page 5, line 9 * * page 5, line 16 - page 6, line 27 * * page 8, line 1 - line 9 * * page 8, line 30 - line 37 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US6587502 (HENDRICHS LAURENT [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 57 * * column 3, line 6 - line 14 * * column 3, line 63 - column 6, line 27 * * column 7, line 19 - column 8, line 64 ** figure 1 * |