EP1733644 - Brush and storing and applying device comprising said brush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [2017/37] |
Former [2006/51] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gueret, Jean-Louis 27 avenue Raymond Poincaré 75016 PARIS / FR | [2017/37] |
Former [2006/51] | 01 /
Gueret, Jean-Louis 27 avenue Raymond Poincaré 75016, PARIS / FR | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/37] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/51] | Tanty, François, et al Nony & Associés, 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06300579.7 | 12.06.2006 | [2006/51] | Priority number, date | FR20050051639 | 15.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0551639 | [2006/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1733644 | Date: | 20.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1733644 | Date: | 13.09.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A46B9/02 | [2006/51] | CPC: |
A46B9/021 (EP);
A45D34/042 (EP);
A45D34/045 (EP);
A46B11/0006 (EP);
A46B2200/1046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/37] |
Former [2006/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Pinsel und Vorrichtung zum Aufbewahren und Auftragen beinhaltend einen solchen Pinsel | [2017/17] | English: | Brush and storing and applying device comprising said brush | [2006/51] | French: | Pinceau et dispositif de conditionnement et d'application comportant un tel pinceau | [2006/51] |
Former [2006/51] | Pinsel und Vorrichtung zum Aufbewahren und Auftragen beinhaltend eine solche Pinsel | Examination procedure | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/51] | 31.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 14.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.06.2006 | AT | 13.09.2017 | CY | 13.09.2017 | CZ | 13.09.2017 | DK | 13.09.2017 | EE | 13.09.2017 | FI | 13.09.2017 | LT | 13.09.2017 | LV | 13.09.2017 | MC | 13.09.2017 | NL | 13.09.2017 | PL | 13.09.2017 | PT | 13.09.2017 | RO | 13.09.2017 | SE | 13.09.2017 | SI | 13.09.2017 | SK | 13.09.2017 | TR | 13.09.2017 | BG | 13.12.2017 | GR | 14.12.2017 | IS | 13.01.2018 | IE | 12.06.2018 | LU | 12.06.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 12.06.2006 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 12.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 12.06.2006 | |
AT | 13.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PT | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 12.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
TR | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 12.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
IE | 12.06.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
LU | 12.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
MC | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SI | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
DK | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 13.09.2017 | |
CZ | 13.09.2017 | ||
EE | 13.09.2017 | ||
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
PL | 13.09.2017 | ||
RO | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
SK | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
IS | 13.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 13.09.2017 | |
FI | 13.09.2017 | ||
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
NL | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
LV | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
BG | 13.12.2017 | ||
GR | 14.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
SE | 13.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 13.09.2017 | |
LT | 13.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 13.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6390708 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [X] 1-32 * column 6, line 54 - column 9, line 57 *; | [X]US6073634 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS H [FR]) [X] 1-32 * column 7, line 60 - column 8, line 94 *; | [X]FR2825247 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [X]FR2663826 (OREAL [FR]) [X] 1-32 * abstract *; | [A]US2004096261 (GUERET JEAN-LOUIS [FR]) [A] 1-32 * page 2, paragraph 35 - page 3, paragraph 50 *; | [A]US4998315 (PESSIS BARBARA A [US]) [A] 1-32 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 15 *; | [A]EP1374723 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-32 * the whole document *; | [A]US6039051 (DORF PAULA [US]) [A] 1-32 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 31 *; | [A]FR2838936 (OREAL [FR]) [A] 1-32 * abstract * | Examination | EP1591036 |