EP1867461 - Multilayered products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2008 [2008/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tarkett SAS 2, rue de l'Egalité 92000 Nanterre / FR | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peres, Richard Route de Neufchâteau, 89 6600 Bastogne / BE | 02 /
Bastin, Pierre rue de la Roche, 49 6600 Bastogne / BE | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Kihn, Pierre Emile Joseph, et al Office Ernest T. Freylinger S.A. 234, route d'Arlon B.P. 48 8001 Strassen / LU | Application number, filing date | 06300581.3 | 12.06.2006 | [2007/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1867461 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C51/14, B32B38/12, B32B27/12 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
B32B27/12 (EP);
B29C51/002 (EP);
B29C51/14 (EP);
B29C51/145 (EP);
B32B38/12 (EP);
B29K2105/06 (EP);
B29K2105/16 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/35] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige Produkte | [2007/51] | English: | Multilayered products | [2007/51] | French: | Produits multicouches | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/51] | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2186449 (BURMAH OIL TRADING LTD [GB]) [A] 1,18,22 * page 1, line 1 - line 26 * * page 2, line 31 - line 35 *; | [A]EP0409080 (EUROFLOOR SA [LU]) [A] 1,18,22 * page 3, line 14 - line 18 * * page 3, line 46 - line 49 * * page 4, line 14 - line 39 * |