EP1739270 - Winding shaft for a roller shutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIAL Rue du Moulin Gillier 42290 Sorbiers / FR | [2007/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dubuy, Freddy Soleymieux 42350 La Talaudiere / FR | [2007/01] | Representative(s) | Thivillier, Patrick Cabinet Laurent & Charras 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville B.P. 203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Thivillier, Patrick Cabinet Laurent & Charras, 3 Place de l'Hôtel de Ville, B.P. 203 42005 Saint-Etienne Cédex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06300718.1 | 23.06.2006 | [2007/01] | Priority number, date | FR20050051766 | 27.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0551766 | [2007/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1739270 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E06B9/171, E06B9/174 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
E06B9/174 (EP);
E06B9/171 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/01] | Title | German: | Wickelwelle für einen Rollladenpanzer | [2007/01] | English: | Winding shaft for a roller shutter | [2007/01] | French: | Tambour d'enroulement pour volet roulant à lames articulées | [2007/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 27.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/25] | 04.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR2845724 (MIDI MOULAGES PLAST [FR]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * figure 1 * [Y] 9; | [Y]US4633927 (LABELLE H M ROBERT [CA]) [Y] 9 * figures 1-5 *; | [X]FR2715432 (PROFALUX [FR]) [X] 1-4,7,9 * figure 2 * |