EP1787681 - Cosmetic composition comprising a liquid fatty phase textured with a bis-urea compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'Oréal 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states L'ORÉAL 14, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chodorowski-Kimmes, Sandrine 6 rue de la Forterelle 60300 Senlis / FR | 02 /
Livoreil, Aude 16 rue du Dragon 75006 Paris / FR | 03 /
Baghdadli, Nawel 237 avenue du Maréchal Leclerc 91300 Massy / FR | 04 /
Rodriguez, Ivan 11 bis Chemin du Marais Hameau de Soutraine 60290 Cauffry / FR | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P. Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/21] | Le Coupanec, Pascale A.M.P. Nony & Associés, 3 rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06301070.6 | 20.10.2006 | [2007/21] | Priority number, date | FR20050053231 | 24.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0553231 | [2007/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1787681 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/21] | Classification | IPC: | A61Q1/10, A61K8/42, A61K8/34, A61K8/31, A61K8/37 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61K8/42 (EP);
A61Q1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kosmetische Zusammensetzung, dessen flüssige Fettphase mit einer Bis-harnstoff-verbindung angedickt wurde | [2007/21] | English: | Cosmetic composition comprising a liquid fatty phase textured with a bis-urea compound | [2007/21] | French: | Composition cosmétique texturée par un dérivé bis-urée à phase grasse liquide texturée par un composé bis-urée | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/21] | 02.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |