EP1801441 - Dry single-disc clutch for vehicle transmission with a device assisting clutch engagement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renault s.a.s. 13-15 quai Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2010/08] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Renault 13-15 quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raoul, Michel 12 allée des Amandiers 78990 Elancourt / FR | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Rougemont, Bernard Renault Technocentre Département Propriété Intellectuelle Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36 1 Avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Rougemont, Bernard Renault Technocentre Département Propriété Intellectuelle Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36 1 Avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/26] | Rougemont, Bernard Renault s.a.s Technocentre Sce 00267 TCR GRA 2 36 1, Avenue du Golf 78288 Guyancourt / FR | Application number, filing date | 06301218.1 | 05.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | FR20050013111 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: FR 0513111 | [2007/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1801441 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1801441 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16D13/04, F16D13/42 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
F16D13/04 (EP);
F16D13/42 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Title | German: | Einscheibentrockenkupplung für Fahrzeuggetriebe mit Verstärkungvorrichtung für das Einkuppeln | [2007/26] | English: | Dry single-disc clutch for vehicle transmission with a device assisting clutch engagement | [2007/26] | French: | Embrayage monodisque sec pour boîte de vitesses de véhicule automobile à dispositif d'assistance à la fermeture | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 20.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.01.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.2010 | CY | 24.02.2010 | CZ | 24.02.2010 | DK | 24.02.2010 | EE | 24.02.2010 | FI | 24.02.2010 | IE | 24.02.2010 | LT | 24.02.2010 | LV | 24.02.2010 | NL | 24.02.2010 | PL | 24.02.2010 | RO | 24.02.2010 | SE | 24.02.2010 | SI | 24.02.2010 | SK | 24.02.2010 | TR | 24.02.2010 | BG | 24.05.2010 | GR | 25.05.2010 | IS | 24.06.2010 | PT | 25.06.2010 | HU | 25.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
HU | 25.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
DK | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.02.2010 | ||
CZ | 24.02.2010 | ||
EE | 24.02.2010 | ||
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IE | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
RO | 24.02.2010 | ||
SE | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
SK | 24.02.2010 | ||
BG | 24.05.2010 | ||
GR | 25.05.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
NL | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 24.02.2010 | |
FI | 24.02.2010 | ||
LT | 24.02.2010 | ||
LV | 24.02.2010 | ||
PL | 24.02.2010 | ||
SI | 24.02.2010 | ||
IS | 24.06.2010 | ||
PT | 25.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB321637 (EDWARD HENRY JAMES CECIL GILLE) [Y] 1-9 * page 1, column L, line 19 - line 41 * * figure 3 *; | [A]US2214819 (NIKOLAUS KIEP JOHANN, et al) [A] 1,4,5,9 * page 1, column L, line 25 - line 57 * * figures 3,5,6 *; | [A]US3096863 (SHEFKE ROBERT A) [A] 1-4 * column 1, line 55 - line 67 * * column 2, line 29 - line 49 ** figures 1-6 *; | [Y]GB1361792 (AUTOMOTIVE PROD CO LTD) [Y] 1-9 * page 2, line 8 - line 59 * * page 2, line 108 - line 130 * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | GB321637 | GB1361792 |