EP1786026 - Method of fabricating first and second separate active semiconductor zones and use for the fabrication of CMOS structures. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, LU | published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states STMICROELECTRONICS S.A. 29 Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | [2013/31] |
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states ST MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 29 Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | |||
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE 25, rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states ST MICROELECTRONICS S.A. 29 Boulevard Romain Rolland 92120 Montrouge / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barbe, Jean-Charles 11 bis Allée de l'école Vaucanson 38100 Grenoble / FR | 02 /
Clavelier, Laurent 11 bis rue Victor Hugo 38700 Voiron / FR | 03 /
Vianay, Benoit 16 bis boulevard Maréchal Joffre 38000 Grenoble / FR | 04 /
Morand, Yves 16, rue Amédée Morel 38000 Grenoble / FR | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké 10 rue d'Arménie - Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | ||
Former [2007/20] | Hecké, Gérard, et al Cabinet Hecké World Trade Center - Europole 5, Place Robert Schuman BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06354035.5 | 31.10.2006 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | FR20050011424 | 09.11.2005 Original published format: FR 0511424 | [2007/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1786026 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1786026 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/20 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
H01L21/02667 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/0245 (EP,US);
H01L21/02488 (EP,US);
H01L21/02496 (EP,US);
H01L21/02505 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/02598 (EP,US);
H01L21/84 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von ersten und zweiten unterschiedlichen, aktiven Halbleiterzonen und Verwendung für die Herstellung von CMOS-Strukturen | [2007/20] | English: | Method of fabricating first and second separate active semiconductor zones and use for the fabrication of CMOS structures. | [2007/20] | French: | Procédé de réalisation de premières et secondes zones actives semi-conductrices distinctes et utilisation pour la fabrication de structures de type C-MOS | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 13.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2006 | AT | 31.07.2013 | BG | 31.07.2013 | CY | 31.07.2013 | CZ | 31.07.2013 | DK | 31.07.2013 | EE | 31.07.2013 | ES | 31.07.2013 | FI | 31.07.2013 | IT | 31.07.2013 | LT | 31.07.2013 | LV | 31.07.2013 | MC | 31.07.2013 | NL | 31.07.2013 | PL | 31.07.2013 | RO | 31.07.2013 | SE | 31.07.2013 | SI | 31.07.2013 | SK | 31.07.2013 | TR | 31.07.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | IE | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | LU | 31.10.2013 | GR | 01.11.2013 | IS | 30.11.2013 | PT | 02.12.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
TR | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
IE | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
IE | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
MC | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
ES | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
IT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
EE | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
SK | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
RO | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
DK | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
NL | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LV | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
SI | 31.07.2013 | ||
GR | 01.11.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
FI | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
PL | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 17.07.2013 | |
AT | 31.07.2013 | ||
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
IS | 30.11.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 31.07.2013 | |
LT | 31.07.2013 | ||
SE | 31.07.2013 | ||
PT | 02.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 31.07.2013 | |
PT | 02.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4751561 (JASTRZEBSKI LUBOMIR L [US]) [A] 1 * figures 1-5 *; | [XY]US5514885 (MYRICK JAMES J [US]) [X] 1-6,9-13 * column 7, line 39 - column 10, line 16; figures 6,7,10 * [Y] 14; | [Y]US2002019105 (HATTORI NOBUYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 14 * paragraphs [0124] , [0125]; figure 17 *; | [A]US2002140033 (BAE GEUM-JONG [KR], et al) [A] 1 * figures 6-12 *; | [A] - YAOCHENG LIU ET AL, "MOSFETs and high-speed photodetectors on ge-on-insulator substrates fabricated using rapid melt growth", ELECTRON DEVICES MEETING, 2004. IEDM TECHNICAL DIGEST. SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA DEC. 13-15, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20041213), ISBN 0-7803-8684-1, pages 1001 - 1004, XP010788979 [A] 1 * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IEDM.2004.1419357 |