EP1716975 - Device for sharpening blade edges [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissements Fischer Castet ZI des Molles Rue du 19 Mars 1962 63300 Thiers / FR | [2006/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raynaud, Jacques Joseph 13 rue Saint Exupéry 63300 Thiers / FR | [2006/44] | Representative(s) | Grand, Guillaume, et al 56 avenue de Royat B.P. 27 63401 Chamalieres Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/44] | Grand, Guillaume, et al 56 avenue de Royat B.P. 27 63401 Chamalieres Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06356040.3 | 07.04.2006 | [2006/44] | Priority number, date | FR20050004176 | 26.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0504176 | [2006/44] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1716975 | Date: | 02.11.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1716975 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B24D15/08 | [2006/44] | CPC: |
B24D15/081 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/44] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Schärfen von Schneidkanten | [2006/44] | English: | Device for sharpening blade edges | [2006/44] | French: | Dispositif pour affiler un tranchant de lame | [2006/44] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 31.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.11.2007 | CY | 14.11.2007 | CZ | 14.11.2007 | DK | 14.11.2007 | EE | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | GB | 14.11.2007 | IE | 14.11.2007 | IT | 14.11.2007 | LT | 14.11.2007 | LV | 14.11.2007 | NL | 14.11.2007 | PL | 14.11.2007 | RO | 14.11.2007 | SI | 14.11.2007 | SK | 14.11.2007 | TR | 14.11.2007 | BG | 14.02.2008 | SE | 14.02.2008 | GR | 15.02.2008 | ES | 25.02.2008 | IS | 14.03.2008 | LU | 07.04.2008 | PT | 14.04.2008 | MC | 30.04.2008 | HU | 15.05.2008 | [2011/17] |
Former [2010/41] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
TR | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
LU | 07.04.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
HU | 15.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
LU | 07.04.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2010/02] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CY | 14.11.2007 | ||
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
EE | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
GR | 15.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
GB | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/51] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
MC | 30.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
IE | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
PT | 14.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
RO | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
SK | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
CZ | 14.11.2007 | ||
DK | 14.11.2007 | ||
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/29] | AT | 14.11.2007 | |
FI | 14.11.2007 | ||
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
LV | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
SI | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 14.11.2007 | |
LT | 14.11.2007 | ||
NL | 14.11.2007 | ||
PL | 14.11.2007 | ||
BG | 14.02.2008 | ||
SE | 14.02.2008 | ||
ES | 25.02.2008 | ||
IS | 14.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2617235 (WALDEMAR LINDAHL HENNING); | [A]US4934110 (JURANITCH JOHN [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US5440953 (GANGELHOFF FRED R [US], et al); | [A]US2004097179 (COZZINI IVO [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |