EP1710374 - Cover system for garage inspection pit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lebec, Gilbert 21 Avenue Fernand Gonnet B.P. 02 84850 Camaret sur Aygues / FR | [2006/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/41] | Representative(s) | Domange, Maxime Cabinet Beau de Lomenie Tour Méditerranée 65 avenue Jules Cantini 13006 Marseille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Domange, Maxime Cabinet Beau de Lomenie 232, avenue du Prado 13295 Marseille Cedex 08 / FR | ||
Former [2006/41] | Domange, Maxime Cabinet Beau de Loménie 232, Avenue du Prado 13295 Marseille Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06358005.4 | 31.03.2006 | [2006/41] | Priority number, date | FR20050003341 | 05.04.2005 Original published format: FR 0503341 | [2006/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1710374 | Date: | 11.10.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/41] | Classification | IPC: | E04H5/06, E06B9/68, E06B9/11 | [2006/41] | CPC: |
E04H5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Abdeckungssystem für Werkstattuntersuchungsgrube | [2006/41] | English: | Cover system for garage inspection pit | [2006/41] | French: | Système de couverture pour fosse de garage | [2006/41] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 18.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |