EP1884515 - Substituted indanyl sulfonamide compounds, their preparation and use as medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.01.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Laboratorios del Dr. Esteve S.A. Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | [2008/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alcalde-Pais, Maria de La Ermitas Fac. de Farm. Univ. de Barcelona Avda. Joan XXIII 08028 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Frigola-Constansa, Jordi Cami de Can Candelier 9-B, 3er ,1a 08960 Sant Just Desvern / ES | 03 /
Holenz, Joerg Plöjarvärgen 19 SE 15023 Enhörna / SE | 04 /
Merce-Vidal, Ramon Avda. Mare de Deu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | 05 /
Mesquida-Estevez, Maria de les Neus Fac. de Farm. Univ. de Barcelona Avda. Joan XXIII 08028 Barcelona / ES | 06 /
Lopez-Perez, Sara Fac. de Farm. Univ. de Barcelona Avda. Joan XXIII 08028 Barcelona / ES | [2008/06] | Representative(s) | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Agustín de Foxá, 4-10 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/06] | Carpintero Lopez, Francisco, et al Herrero & Asociados, S.L. Alcalá 35 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06380220.1 | 31.07.2006 | [2008/06] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1884515 | Date: | 06.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07D295/12, C07D333/62, C07D513/04, A61K31/429, A61K31/496 | [2008/06] | CPC: |
C07D295/135 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2008/42] |
Former [2008/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Substituierte Indanylsulfonamid-Verbindungen, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung als Medikament | [2008/06] | English: | Substituted indanyl sulfonamide compounds, their preparation and use as medicaments | [2008/06] | French: | Composés indanylsulfamides, leur préparation et utilisation comme médicament | [2008/06] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/10] | 12.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4129656 (LANG HANS-JOCHEN, et al) [X] 20,21 * examples 1-4 *; | [A]EP0088282 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [A] 1-19,22-27 * Formula I;; page 1, lines 14-30 *; | [A]EP0456133 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-19,22-27 * Formula I;; page 3, lines 30-51 *; | [A]EP0747374 (SQUIBB BRISTOL MYERS CO [US]) [A] 1-19,22-27 * Formula I;; page 14, lines 11-46 *; | [X] - CLEMENS RUFER, FRANK BAHLMANN, EBERHARD SCHRÖDER, IRMGARD BÖTTCHER, "Nichtsteroidale Entzündungshemmer 8. Entzündungshemmende Methansulfonanilide III", EUR. J. MED. CHEM. CHIM. THER., (1982), vol. 17, no. 2, pages 173 - 180, XP009075830 [X] 20,21 * Schemes 1, 4;;; tables 2-5,8 * | [X] - CHUN-SING LI, W. CAMERON BLACK, CHI-CHUNG CHAN, ANTHONY FORD-HUTCHINSON, JACQUES-YVES GAUTHIER, ROBERT GORDON, DANIEL GUAY ET AL., "Cyclooxygenase-2 Inhibitors. Synthesis and Pharmacological Activities of 5-Methanesulfonamido-1-indanone Derivatives", J. MED. CHEM., (1995), vol. 38, pages 4897 - 4905, XP002410328 [X] 20,21 * tables 1-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00025a007 | [X] - NATHALIE QUIMET, CHI-CHUNG CHAN, STELLA CARLESON, DAVID CLAVEAU, ROBERT GORDON, DANIEL GUAY, CHUN-SING LI, MARC OUELLET, ET AL., "Substituted heterocyclic analogs as selective COX-2 inhibitors in the Flosulide class", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1999), vol. 9, pages 151 - 156, XP002410329 [X] 20,21 * tables 1-3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00705-7 | [X] - CHANG HA PARK, XAVIER SIOMBOING, SAID YOUS, BERNARD GRESSIER, MICHEL LUYCKX, PHILIPPE CHAVATTE, "Investigations of new lead structures for the design of novel cyclooxygenase-2 inhibitors", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 37, pages 461 - 468, XP002410330 [X] 20,21 * figures 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0223-5234(02)01373-9 |