EP1881415 - Folding of input data values to a transform function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Svensson, Jim Ekegårdsgatan 14 372 30 Ronneby / SE | 02 /
Wilhelmsson, Leif Lyftvägen 5 240 10 Dalby / SE | 03 /
Olsson, Thomas Kroken 6 374 37 Karlshamn / SE | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Boesen, Johnny Peder, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 06388052.0 | 18.07.2006 | [2008/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881415 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881415 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/14 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
G06F17/142 (EP,US);
H04L27/263 (EP,US);
H04L27/2651 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Title | German: | Faltung von Eingabedatenwerten für eine Transformation | [2008/04] | English: | Folding of input data values to a transform function | [2008/04] | French: | Pliage de valeurs de données d'entrée pour une transformée | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 11.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 09.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2010 | BE | 28.04.2010 | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | LT | 28.04.2010 | LV | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | IE | 18.07.2010 | LU | 18.07.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | GB | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | CH | 31.07.2010 | LI | 31.07.2010 | MC | 31.07.2010 | FR | 02.08.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | IS | 28.08.2010 | PT | 30.08.2010 | HU | 29.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 18.07.2010 | ||
LU | 18.07.2010 | ||
GB | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 18.07.2010 | ||
LU | 18.07.2010 | ||
GB | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 18.07.2010 | ||
GB | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
HU | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
BG | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 18.07.2010 | ||
GB | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 18.07.2010 | ||
GB | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
FR | 02.08.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
CH | 31.07.2010 | ||
LI | 31.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
BE | 28.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.04.2010 | ||
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
PT | 30.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 28.04.2010 | |
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0178290 (COMSAT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figure 7 *; | [Y]WO2005008516 (SIWORKS INC [CA]) [Y] 4,5,12,13,17 * page 11, line 17 - page 13, line 19; figure 10 *; | [X]WO2005079033 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-11,15,16,18-20 * paragraphs [0002] - [0007] * * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0032] - [0034]; figure 3 * * paragraphs [0045] - [0047]; figure 7 *; | [XY] - ALASTI H ET AL, "A discrete multi carrier multiple access technique for wireless communications", VEHICULAR TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE, 1998. VTC 98. 48TH IEEE OTTAWA, ONT., CANADA 18-21 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980518), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-4320-4, pages 1533 - 1537, XP010288028 [X] 1-3,6-11,15,16,18-20 * section II; figures 3(d), 4(b) * [Y] 4,5,12,13,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETEC.1998.686545 | [A] - HE S ET AL, "VLSI computation of the partial DFT for (de)modulation in multi-channel OFDM system", PROCEEDINGS OF SIXTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON PERSONAL, INDOOR AND MOBILE RADIO COMMUNICATIONS 1995 (PIMRC'95), 27-29 SEPTEMBER 1995, (19950927), vol. 3, pages 1257 - 1261, XP002441474 [A] 1-20 * sections II and III * * figures 4,5,6 * | [A] - HE S ET AL, "Computing Partial DFT for Comb Spectrum Evaluation", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, (199606), vol. 3, no. 6, ISSN 1070-9908, pages 173 - 175, XP011059857 [A] 1-20 * sections II - IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/97.503281 | [A] - SINGH S ET AL, "Architecturally efficient FFT pruning algorithm", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, (20051110), vol. 41, no. 23, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1305 - 1306, XP006025601 [A] 1-20 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:20052994 | [T] - KHAN Z A ET AL, "Fast computation of partial DFT for comb spectrum evaluation", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS, (200612), vol. 13, no. 12, pages 721 - 724, XP002441475 [T] 1-20 * abstract * * section II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LSP.2006.879867 |