EP1763094 - Structure and fabrication of an MRAM cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MagIC Technologies Inc. 463-471 South Milpitas Blvd. Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2007/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liubo, Hong 945 Summerleaf Place San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 02 /
Mao-Min, Chen 1025 Woodview Place San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 03 /
Tai, Min 4279 Mackin Woods Lane San Jose, CA 95135 / US | 04 /
Jun, Chen 3879 Jersey Road Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes-sur-Mer / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | Schuffenecker, Thierry 120 Chemin de la Maure 06800 Cagnes sur Mer / FR | Application number, filing date | 06392010.2 | 05.09.2006 | [2007/11] | Priority number, date | US20050221146 | 07.09.2005 Original published format: US 221146 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763094 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1763094 | Date: | 09.02.2011 | [2011/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H01L43/12 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
H10N50/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Title | German: | Struktur und Herstellung einer MRAM-Zelle | [2007/11] | English: | Structure and fabrication of an MRAM cell | [2007/11] | French: | Structure et fabrication d'une cellule MRAM | [2007/11] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/38] | 14.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.01.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 07.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Appeal following examination | 21.04.2013 | Appeal received No. T1497/13 | 19.06.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 20.07.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was deemed to be withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.09.2011 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.06.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 30.06.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002191354 (YOSHIKAWA MASATOSHI [JP], et al); | [XA]US2004087039 (GUPTA ARUNAVA [US], et al); | [XA]US2005141148 (AIKAWA HISANORI [JP], et al); | [AP]US2006011959 (PARK JAE-HYUN [KR], et al) | Examination | US2003047728 | US2003059958 | US2004137681 | US2005127416 | by applicant | US6174737 | US6713802 | US2004087039 | US6783999 | US6784091 | US6806096 | US6815248 | US6852550 | US6858441 | US6881351 | US2005141148 |