EP1887330 - Method for testing pipettes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOHIT OYJ Laippatie 1 00880 Helsinki / FI | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hemmings, Ian 7 Joseph Fletcher Drive Wingersworth Chesterfield, Derbyshire S42 6TZ / GB | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Matilainen, Mirja Helena Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen AB Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Matilainen, Mirja Helena Oy Jalo Ant-Wuorinen AB, Iso Roobertinkatu 4-6 A 00120 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06397017.2 | 11.08.2006 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1887330 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887330 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01F25/00, B01L3/02 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
B01L3/0275 (EP,US);
B01L2200/148 (EP,US);
G01N35/1016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | Testverfahren für Pipetten | [2008/07] | English: | Method for testing pipettes | [2008/07] | French: | Procédé de test de pipettes | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 30.07.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.11.2009 | BE | 18.11.2009 | CY | 18.11.2009 | CZ | 18.11.2009 | EE | 18.11.2009 | LT | 18.11.2009 | LV | 18.11.2009 | RO | 18.11.2009 | SI | 18.11.2009 | SK | 18.11.2009 | TR | 18.11.2009 | BG | 18.02.2010 | GR | 19.02.2010 | ES | 28.02.2010 | IS | 18.03.2010 | PT | 18.03.2010 | HU | 19.05.2010 | IE | 11.08.2010 | LU | 11.08.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
LU | 11.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
HU | 19.05.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
IE | 11.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
GR | 19.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2009 | ||
EE | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
RO | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
SK | 18.11.2009 | ||
BG | 18.02.2010 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
BE | 18.11.2009 | ||
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 18.11.2009 | |
CY | 18.11.2009 | ||
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 18.11.2009 | |
LT | 18.11.2009 | ||
LV | 18.11.2009 | ||
SI | 18.11.2009 | ||
ES | 28.02.2010 | ||
IS | 18.03.2010 | ||
PT | 18.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 28.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4896270 (KALMAKIS GEORGE P [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 3 * * column 4, line 1 - line 43 * * claim 2 *; | [A]WO0200345 (VISTALAB TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-7* page 9, line 16 - line 27 *; | [A] - ANONYMOUS, "Quick Audit", INTERNET CITATION, (20041012), URL: http://web.archive.org/web*/http://www.accuteklab.com/quickaudit.html, (20060807), XP002393677 [A] 1-7 * the whole document * |