EP1808380 - Flexible pouch for a liquid and method of manufacturing thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pepup S.A. Quai des Forces-Motrices 14 1204 Geneva / CH | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Risgalla, Eric Rue de Saint-Léger 28 1204 Genève / CH | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Reuteler, Raymond Werner Reuteler & Cie SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29 1260 Nyon / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Reuteler, Raymond Werner Reuteler & cie SA Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29 1260 Nyon / CH | Application number, filing date | 06405012.3 | 13.01.2006 | [2007/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1808380 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D75/58, B65D75/48 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
B65D75/5822 (EP,US);
B31B70/00 (EP,US);
B65D75/48 (EP,US);
B31B2155/00 (EP,US);
B31B2155/0012 (EP,US);
B31B2155/002 (EP,US);
B31B2160/10 (EP,US);
B31B70/64 (EP,US);
B31B70/855 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/13] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flexibler Beutel für eine Flüssigkeit und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2007/29] | English: | Flexible pouch for a liquid and method of manufacturing thereof | [2007/29] | French: | Récipient souple pour liquide et méthode pour sa fabrication | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/29] | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB867329 (VALER FLAX) [X] 1-10 * page 1, line 59 - page 3, line 33 * * figures 1-8 *; | [A]GB1296216 (PAYNTER MJ) [A] 1 * page 1, line 69 - page 2, line 37 * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US4171755 (CARLISLE RICHARD S [US]) [A] 1,8 * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 14 * * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 12 * * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US5366296 (STENSTROM LENNART A [SE], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 34-48 ** figure 1 *; | [DX]WO2004087526 (PAKERMAN S A [CH], et al) [DX] 1-3,8 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB769810 | US3278085 | US4988016 | US5228782 | US5411178 | US6244468 | WO2004087526 |