EP1701228 - Watch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aurema SA Jurastrasse 74 2540 Grenchen / CH | [2006/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Von Burg, Ursula Jurastrasse 74 CH-2540 Grenchen / CH | [2011/07] |
Former [2006/37] | 01 /
Von Borg, Ursula Jurastrasse 74 CH-2540 Grenchen / CH | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | ||
Former [2006/37] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 06405069.3 | 14.02.2006 | [2006/37] | Priority number, date | CH20050000391 | 07.03.2005 Original published format: CH 3912005 | [2006/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1701228 | Date: | 13.09.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1701228 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | [2010/50] | Type: | A9 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1701228 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | [2011/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1701228 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G04B37/08, G04B37/22, G04B45/00, G04B45/02 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
G04B45/0015 (EP);
G04B37/082 (EP);
G04B37/225 (EP);
G04B45/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/37] | Title | German: | Uhr | [2006/37] | English: | Watch | [2006/37] | French: | Montre | [2006/37] | Examination procedure | 26.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 30.11.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2006 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | TR | 16.05.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
TR | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]CH671493 (ANTONIO PEREZ) [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0873543 (COMADUR SA [CH]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] * * figure - *; | [A]FR614063 (CIE DES MONTRES NOVALIS S A) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | CH671493 |