EP1839798 - Apparatus for laser cutting and/or marking using fixed motors and transmission belt for moving a laser light emitter ; Method using such apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/40] | Apparatus and method for laser cutting and/or marking using fixed motors and transmission belt for moving a laser light emitter | ||
[2012/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEI S.p.A. Via R. Ruffilli 1 24035 Curno (BG) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states SEI S.p.A. Via R. Ruffilli 1 24035 Curno BG / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fustinoni, Ettore Via G. DeGrassi, 39 24126 Bergamo / IT | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga 16 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/40] | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425205.9 | 27.03.2006 | [2007/40] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1839798 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1839798 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/08, B23Q1/62, B23K26/38, B23Q5/34, F16H19/00, B25J9/10, B23K26/10 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
B23K26/10 (EP,US);
B23K26/38 (EP,US);
B23Q1/621 (EP,US);
B25J9/026 (EP,US);
B25J9/104 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18848 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Laserschneiden und/oder -markieren unter Verwendung von fixierten Antrieben und Antriebriemen zur Bewegung des Laserstrahlsenders ; Verfahren unter Verwendung einer solchen Vorrichtung | [2012/20] | English: | Apparatus for laser cutting and/or marking using fixed motors and transmission belt for moving a laser light emitter ; Method using such apparatus | [2012/18] | French: | Appareil de découpage ou marquage laser utilisant des moteurs fixes et une courroie de transmission pour déplacer l'émetteur laser ; Méthode utilisant un tel appareil | [2012/18] |
Former [2007/40] | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Laserschneiden und/oder -markieren unter Verwendung von fixierten Antrieben und Antriebriemen zur Bewegung des Laserstrahlsenders | ||
Former [2007/40] | Apparatus and method for laser cutting and/or marking using fixed motors and transmission belt for moving a laser light emitter | ||
Former [2007/40] | Appareil et méthode de découpage ou marquage laser utilisant des moteurs fixes et une courroie de transmission pour déplacer l'émetteur laser | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 28.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 12.01.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2006 | AT | 19.09.2012 | BE | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | ES | 30.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | GB | 27.03.2013 | IE | 27.03.2013 | LU | 27.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
GB | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
GB | 27.03.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
IE | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9637346 (GUARINI VITTORIO [IT]) [X] 1-5,7-10,13,14 * page 1, paragraph 3 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraphs 1-3 * * page 8, paragraphs 1,2; figures 1-3 * [Y] 6,11,12; | [Y]DE4444523 (REINECKE UWE DIPL ING [DE]) [Y] 6,13 * column 1, lines 11-28 * * column 4, lines 12-38; figure 1 *; | [Y]US2785941 (SUTHERLAND MACKLEM F, et al) [Y] 11,12 * column 1, lines 25-36 * * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 39; figure 1 *; | [Y]WO9914011 (TRODAT WERKE WALTER JUST GMBH [AT], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-11,13,14 * abstract *; | [Y]GB2391535 (BRENNAN JOHN MICHAEL [GB]) [Y] 1-5,7-11,13,14 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 1, paragraph 7 - page 2, paragraph 3; figure . *; | [A]US6070480 (KERSCHNER RONALD K [US]) [A] 1-5,7-11,13,14 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 26; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2564356 (BENEDITE CLAUDE LASER TECH [FR]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * | by applicant | US6772661 | US6192777 | WO2005113183 | WO9637346 | DE4444523 | US2785941 | WO9914011 | GB2391535 | US6070480 |