EP1867600 - Gripper for containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIDEL HOLDINGS & TECHNOLOGY S.A. Avenue du Général Guisan 70 1009 Pully / CH | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Preti, Fabrizio Via S. Lazzaro, 31 43015 Noceto (Parma) / IT | 02 /
Barbieri, Massimiliano Strada Cava in Vigatto, 63 43100 Corcagnano (Parma) / IT | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Long, Giorgio, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425399.0 | 14.06.2006 | [2007/51] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1867600 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1867600 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/24, B65G47/90 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
B65G47/847 (EP,US);
B67C3/242 (EP,US);
B65G2201/0247 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Title | German: | Greifer für Behälter | [2007/51] | English: | Gripper for containers | [2007/51] | French: | Pinces pour récipients | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 02.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.03.2009 | BE | 25.03.2009 | CY | 25.03.2009 | CZ | 25.03.2009 | DK | 25.03.2009 | EE | 25.03.2009 | FI | 25.03.2009 | LT | 25.03.2009 | LV | 25.03.2009 | NL | 25.03.2009 | PL | 25.03.2009 | RO | 25.03.2009 | SI | 25.03.2009 | SK | 25.03.2009 | TR | 25.03.2009 | IE | 14.06.2009 | LU | 14.06.2009 | BG | 25.06.2009 | SE | 25.06.2009 | GR | 26.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | IS | 25.07.2009 | HU | 26.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
LU | 14.06.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
HU | 26.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
LU | 14.06.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
GR | 26.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
IE | 14.06.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
DK | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
BG | 25.06.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 25.03.2009 | |
BE | 25.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.03.2009 | ||
EE | 25.03.2009 | ||
FI | 25.03.2009 | ||
LT | 25.03.2009 | ||
LV | 25.03.2009 | ||
NL | 25.03.2009 | ||
PL | 25.03.2009 | ||
RO | 25.03.2009 | ||
SI | 25.03.2009 | ||
SK | 25.03.2009 | ||
SE | 25.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0005402 (BEDIN JEAN) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0486439 (MARCHESINI MAURIZIO [IT]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 4 - line 20 * * column 3, line 39 - line 45; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE10140315 (TETRA LAVAL HOLDINGS & FINANCE [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO03078285 (SIPA PROGETTAZIONE AUTOMAZ [IT], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |