EP1878611 - Seat, in particular a vehicle seat, with means for deviating a ventilation flow based on Coanda effect [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2009/11] |
Former [2008/03] | For all designated states C.R.F. SOCIETA' CONSORTILE PER AZIONI Strada Torino, 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Alacqua, Stefano, c/o S.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 02 /
Biasiotto, Marco, c/o S.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 03 /
Perosino, Andrea, c/o S.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | 04 /
Innocenti, Gianfranco, c/o S.R.F. Società Consortile per Azioni Strada Torino 50 10043 Orbassano (Torino) / IT | [2008/03] | Representative(s) | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Gallarotti, Franco Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Srl, Via Maria Vittoria, 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425483.2 | 11.07.2006 | [2008/03] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1878611 | Date: | 16.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1878611 | Date: | 11.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/56 | [2008/03] | CPC: |
B60N2/5657 (EP,US);
B60N2/5628 (EP,US);
B60N2/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/03] | Title | German: | Sitz, insbesondere Fahrzeugsitz, mit Mitteln zur Ablenkung des Ventilationsstroms basierend auf dem Coanda-Effekt | [2008/03] | English: | Seat, in particular a vehicle seat, with means for deviating a ventilation flow based on Coanda effect | [2008/03] | French: | Siège, en particulier siège de véhicule, avec des moyens pour déviation d'un flux de ventilation basé sur l'effet coanda | [2008/03] | Examination procedure | 14.05.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.05.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 22.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.03.2009 | BE | 11.03.2009 | CY | 11.03.2009 | CZ | 11.03.2009 | DK | 11.03.2009 | EE | 11.03.2009 | FI | 11.03.2009 | LT | 11.03.2009 | LV | 11.03.2009 | NL | 11.03.2009 | PL | 11.03.2009 | RO | 11.03.2009 | SI | 11.03.2009 | SK | 11.03.2009 | TR | 11.03.2009 | BG | 11.06.2009 | SE | 11.06.2009 | GR | 12.06.2009 | ES | 22.06.2009 | IE | 11.07.2009 | IS | 11.07.2009 | LU | 11.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | PT | 24.08.2009 | HU | 12.09.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IE | 11.07.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
LU | 11.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
HU | 12.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IE | 11.07.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
LU | 11.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
GR | 12.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IE | 11.07.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IE | 11.07.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
DK | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
BG | 11.06.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 11.03.2009 | |
BE | 11.03.2009 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2009 | ||
EE | 11.03.2009 | ||
FI | 11.03.2009 | ||
LT | 11.03.2009 | ||
LV | 11.03.2009 | ||
NL | 11.03.2009 | ||
PL | 11.03.2009 | ||
RO | 11.03.2009 | ||
SI | 11.03.2009 | ||
SK | 11.03.2009 | ||
SE | 11.06.2009 | ||
ES | 22.06.2009 | ||
IS | 11.07.2009 | ||
PT | 24.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1088696 (WEBASTO KLIMATECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 8,9,11 * column 3, line 33 - column 8, line 40; figure - * [Y] 1,2,4,10; | [Y]EP1382472 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT]) [Y] 1,2,4,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004065149 (FIAT RICERCHE [IT], et al) [A] 1,2,4,10* the whole document *; | [A]WO2005105516 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |