EP1881203 - Hydraulically actuated valve and a hydraulic circuit for activating a brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosch Rexroth Oil Control S.p.A. Via Colonna Marco Antonio 35 20149 Milano (MI) / IT | [2008/31] |
Former [2008/04] | For all designated states OIL CONTROL S.p.A. Viale Majno, 17 20122 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Storci, Andrea Via Monchio, 3 41015 Nonantola (Modena) / IT | [2008/04] | Representative(s) | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via M. Vellani, 20 41124 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/04] | Gotra, Stefano BUGNION S.p.A. Via Vellani Marchi, 20 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425517.7 | 21.07.2006 | [2008/04] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1881203 | Date: | 23.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1881203 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/04, F15B13/042 | [2008/04] | CPC: |
F16K31/124 (EP);
F15B13/0402 (EP);
F15B13/0422 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/04] | Title | German: | Hydraulisch betätigtes Ventil und Hydrauliksystem zur Betätigung einer Bremse | [2008/04] | English: | Hydraulically actuated valve and a hydraulic circuit for activating a brake | [2008/04] | French: | Soupape pilotée et système hydraulique d'actionnement de frein | [2008/04] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/32] | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2010 | BE | 13.10.2010 | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | HU | 13.10.2010 | LT | 13.10.2010 | LV | 13.10.2010 | NL | 13.10.2010 | PL | 13.10.2010 | RO | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | IS | 13.02.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
RO | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
BE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 13.10.2010 | |
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 13.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4802505 (GEMIGNANI ANDRE [FR], et al) [X] 1 * column 3, line 29 - column 5, line 21; figures 2-6 * [Y] 10,11; | [Y]JPH0363328 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD) [Y] 10,11 * abstract ** figure 2 * | by applicant | US4802505 | JPH0363328B |