EP1911868 - A device and a process of producing a shaped non-woven matting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.03.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.04.2009 [2009/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FARE' S.p.A. Via Pastrengo, 31/33 I-21054 Fagnano Olona Varese / IT | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fare', Rosaldo Via Papa Giovanni XXIII, 20 21054 Fagnano Olona (VA) / IT | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Gislon, Gabriele, et al Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 06425700.9 | 11.10.2006 | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1911868 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D04H3/16 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
D04H3/14 (EP);
D04H3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/52] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Herstellung einer geformten Vliesstoffmatte | [2008/16] | English: | A device and a process of producing a shaped non-woven matting | [2008/16] | French: | Installation et procéssus pour produire un tapis non-tissé mis en forme | [2008/16] | Examination procedure | 17.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/16] | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/16] | 09.12.2008 | Request for conversion into a national application, for IT [2009/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4252590 (RASEN ALFRED, et al) [X] 1-10* column 9, line 45 - column 10, line 9; figures 1,4 *; | [X]JPH0838834 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [X] 1-10 * figure 2a *; | [X]EP1241288 (TOYODA BOSHOKU KK [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0004] , [0007] , [0012] , [0017] , [0019] , [0024] - [0028] - [0032] , [0034] , [0044]; figures 1a-3 *; | [X]US2003201579 (GORDON GREGORY CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0096] - [0099] , [0100] , [0127] , [0152] , [0153] , [0157] , [0158] , [0165] , [0166] , [0174] , [0178] * * paragraphs [0179] , [0197]; figures 1-9a * |