EP1894571 - Use of modified interleukin-8 proteins for treating reperfusion injury or transplant rejection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2008 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ProtAffin Biotechnologie AG Impulszentrum Graz-West Reininghausstrasse 13a 8020 Graz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states Protaffin Biotechnologie AG Impulszentrum Graz-West Reininghausstrasse 13a 8020 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kungl, Andreas.J. Strasserhofweg 77a 8045 Graz / AT | 02 /
Bedke, Jens Hauptstrasse 50 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 03 /
Gröne, Hermann-Josef Im Moselsgrund 17 69118 Heidelberg / DE | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06450117.4 | 29.08.2006 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1894571 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20, C12N15/00, A61P37/06 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
A61K38/2053 (EP,US);
A61K38/13 (EP,US);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
C07K14/5421 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/13, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verwendung von modifizierten IL-8 Proteinen zur Behandlung von Reperfusionsschäden und Transplantatabstossung | [2008/10] | English: | Use of modified interleukin-8 proteins for treating reperfusion injury or transplant rejection | [2008/10] | French: | Utilisations de protéines IL-8 modifiées pour traiter les dommages dûs à la reperfusion et le rejet de greffe | [2008/10] | Examination procedure | 15.07.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5665346 (CLARK-LEWIS IAN [CA], et al) [AD] 1-11 * see abstract, col.6 lines 7-20, col.1 lines 55-60 *; | [Y]WO2004058189 (UNIV TEXAS [US]) [Y] 1-11* see claims 1,4,40, page 24 table 1 *; | [YD]WO2005054285 (KUNGL ANDREAS J [AT]) [YD] 1-11 * see claims 1-14, 21-22 and page 3 table 1 *; | [DY] - CUGINI D. ET AL., "Inhibition of the chemokine receptor CXCR2 prevents kidney graft function deterioration due to ischemia/reperfusion", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (2005), vol. 67, pages 1753 - 1761, XP002421838 [DY] 1-11 * see abstract and pages 1753-1754 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1523-1755.2005.00272.x | [A] - KUSCHERT G S V ET AL, "Identification of a glycosaminoglycan binding surface on human interleukin-8", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, US, (19980811), vol. 37, no. 32, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 11193 - 11201, XP002273720 [A] 1-11 * see abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi972867o | [A] - WILLIAMS GLYN ET AL, "Mutagenesis studies of interleukin-8: Identification of a second epitope involved in receptor binding", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (1996), vol. 271, no. 16, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 9579 - 9586, XP002410539 [A] 1-11 * see abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.271.16.9579 |