EP1873741 - Lighting advertising element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koper, Michal Ul. Unicka 7/35 20-126 Lublin / PL | [2008/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/01] | Representative(s) | Kalita, Lucjan Kancelaria Patentowa ul. Wyzynna 45/2 20-560 Lublin / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/01] | Kalita, Lucjan Kancelaria Patentowa ul. Wyzynna 45/2 20-560 Lublin / PL | Application number, filing date | 06460019.0 | 26.06.2006 | [2008/01] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1873741 | Date: | 02.01.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1873741 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09F13/22, // G09F13/18 | [2008/01] | CPC: |
G09F13/22 (EP);
G09F13/0409 (EP);
G09F2013/1804 (EP);
G09F2013/1831 (EP);
G09F2013/1895 (EP);
G09F2013/222 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] |
Former [2008/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, LI | ||
Former [2008/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | HR | 19.05.2008 | Title | German: | Beleuchtungselement für eine Werbung | [2008/01] | English: | Lighting advertising element | [2008/01] | French: | Dispositif pour l'éclairage d'une affiche publicitaire | [2010/13] |
Former [2008/01] | Dispositif pour l'eclairage d'une affiche publicitaire | Examination procedure | 07.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 07.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 08.09.2010 | CY | 08.09.2010 | CZ | 08.09.2010 | DK | 08.09.2010 | EE | 08.09.2010 | FI | 08.09.2010 | HU | 08.09.2010 | LT | 08.09.2010 | LV | 08.09.2010 | NL | 08.09.2010 | RO | 08.09.2010 | SE | 08.09.2010 | SI | 08.09.2010 | SK | 08.09.2010 | TR | 08.09.2010 | BG | 08.12.2010 | GR | 09.12.2010 | IS | 08.01.2011 | PT | 10.01.2011 | [2014/20] |
Former [2013/45] | BE | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
HU | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
TR | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | BE | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
BG | 08.12.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | BE | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
DK | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | BE | 08.09.2010 | |
CY | 08.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
RO | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
PT | 10.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
CZ | 08.09.2010 | ||
EE | 08.09.2010 | ||
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
SK | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
IS | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 08.09.2010 | |
FI | 08.09.2010 | ||
LT | 08.09.2010 | ||
LV | 08.09.2010 | ||
NL | 08.09.2010 | ||
SE | 08.09.2010 | ||
SI | 08.09.2010 | ||
GR | 09.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | LT | 08.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE20008713U (REKLAME CONRAD WILDEN NACHF GM [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 12 - page 6, line 11 ** figures 1-3 *; | [DA]WO0179748 (MAXXLUXX LICHTWERBUNG GMBH [DE], et al) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 2,5 *; | [DA]US6361186 (SLAYDEN JAMES C [US]) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-7 *; | [A]US6874924 (HULSE ET AL.) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * |