EP1855741 - ADMINISTERING DEVICE COMPRISING A DISPLAY DRUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 30.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.03.2017 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TecPharma Licensing AG Brunnmattstrasse 6 3401 Burgdorf / CH | [2007/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRCHHOFER, Fritz Wassermatt CH-3454 Sumiswald / CH | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/14] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte P.O. Box 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06700025.7 | 11.01.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006CH00018 | Priority number, date | DE20051008280 | 23.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005008280 | [2007/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006089436 | Date: | 31.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1855741 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1855741 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/07] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1855741 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M5/24 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
A61M5/31551 (EP,US);
A61M2005/3125 (US);
A61M2005/3126 (US);
A61M2205/581 (EP,US);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/31528 (US);
A61M5/31548 (US);
A61M5/3155 (US);
A61M5/31558 (EP,US);
A61M5/31561 (EP,US);
A61M5/31575 (EP,US);
A61M5/31585 (EP,US);
A61M5/31593 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/14] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERABREICHUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT ANZEIGETROMMEL | [2007/47] | English: | ADMINISTERING DEVICE COMPRISING A DISPLAY DRUM | [2007/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION COMPORTANT UN TAMBOUR D'AFFICHAGE | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 09.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09152374.6 / EP2058021 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.11.2009
30.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Haselmeier GmbH Dufourstr. 32 8008 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative RDL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Senefelderstrasse 26 70176 Stuttgart / DE | 02
10.11.2009
30.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst (Gebäude K 703) 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.11.2009
30.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Haselmeier GmbH Dufourstr. 32 8008 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Raible Deissler Lehmann Patentanwälte Bolzstraße 3 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
10.11.2009
30.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst (Gebäude K 703) 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
Former [2014/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.11.2009
30.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Haselmeier GmbH Dufourstr. 32 8008 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Raible, Tobias Raible & Raible Patentanwälte Bolzstrasse 3 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
10.11.2009
30.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst (Gebäude K 703) 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
Former [2013/01] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.11.2009
30.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Haselmeier GmbH Dufourstr. 32 8008 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Raible, Tobias Raible & Raible Schoderstrasse 10 70192 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
10.11.2009
30.11.2009
ADMISSIBLE Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst (Gebäude K 703) 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Dahmen, Michael Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte Cronstettenstraße 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | |||
Former [2009/51] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.11.2009
Haselmeier GmbH Dufourstr. 32 8008 Zürich / CH Opponent's representative Raible, Tobias Raible & Raible Schoderstrasse 10 70192 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02
10.11.2009
Sanofi-Aventis Deutschland GmbH Industriepark Höchst 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Dahmen, Michael Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte Cronstettenstraße 66 D-60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | 16.12.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.06.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 31.01.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 08.06.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 11.01.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 05.04.2012 | Appeal received No. T0735/12 | 09.06.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.06.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 02.04.2012 | Appeal received No. T0735/12 | 08.06.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.06.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 29.03.2012 | Appeal received No. T0735/12 | 24.05.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 08.06.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 08.06.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 16.06.2016 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 11.02.2009 | CZ | 11.02.2009 | EE | 11.02.2009 | FI | 11.02.2009 | IE | 11.02.2009 | LT | 11.02.2009 | LV | 11.02.2009 | NL | 11.02.2009 | RO | 11.02.2009 | SI | 11.02.2009 | SK | 11.02.2009 | TR | 11.02.2009 | BG | 11.05.2009 | GR | 12.05.2009 | IS | 11.06.2009 | PT | 13.07.2009 | LU | 11.01.2010 | BE | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | [2015/22] |
Former [2011/17] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
GR | 12.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/14] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
BG | 11.05.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | CZ | 11.02.2009 | |
EE | 11.02.2009 | ||
FI | 11.02.2009 | ||
IE | 11.02.2009 | ||
LT | 11.02.2009 | ||
LV | 11.02.2009 | ||
NL | 11.02.2009 | ||
RO | 11.02.2009 | ||
SI | 11.02.2009 | ||
SK | 11.02.2009 | ||
IS | 11.06.2009 | ||
PT | 13.07.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5320609 (HABER TERRY M [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]US5626566 (PETERSEN LARS P K [DK], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO9938554 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK]) [DX] 1,6,7,11,12,19-21 * page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 19 * * figures 6-10 *; | [A]DE10229138 (DISETRONIC LICENSING AG [CH]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [PX]DE20317377U (B D MEDICO S A R L [CH]) [PX] 1-10,12,14,15,17-21* the whole document * | Opposition | DD234613 | US5320609 | US5626566 | DE69223521T | WO9938554 | EP0937476 | WO0195959 | US2002052578 | WO03075985 | DE10229138 | DE10232411 | WO2004078239 | WO2004078242 | US2005033244 | WO2005046770 | - EHRHARDT A. ET AL, LUEGER, Lexikon der Technik, STUTTGART, DEUTSCHE VERLAG-ANSTALT, page 176 | - BROCKHAUS, Naturwissenschaften und Technik, WIESBADEN, F.A. BROCKHAUS, (1983), vol. 10, page 90 | - Auszug aus Wikipedia http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Complement_(disambiguation) |