EP1846248 - SELF-INKING HAND STAMP WITH SPARE INK SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colop Stempelerzeugung Skopek Gesellschaft m.b.H. & Co. KG. Dr. Franz Armingstrasse 5 4600 Wels / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states Colop Stempelerzeugung Skopek Gesellschaft m.b.H. & Co. KG. Dr. Franz Armingstrasse 5 4600 Wels / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOODY, Brett 518 Marigold Corona Del Mar, CA 92625 / US | [2007/43] | Representative(s) | SONN Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/43] | Sonn & Partner Patentanwälte Riemergasse 14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06700100.8 | 04.01.2006 | [2007/43] | WO2006AT00004 | Priority number, date | US20050030531 | 04.01.2005 Original published format: US 30531 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006072121 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1846248 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1846248 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41K1/40 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
B41K1/52 (EP,US);
B41K1/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/52] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SELBSTFÄRBENDER HANDSTEMPEL MIT ERSATZTINTENVERSORGUNG | [2007/43] | English: | SELF-INKING HAND STAMP WITH SPARE INK SUPPLY | [2007/43] | French: | TAMPON MANUEL AUTO-ENCREUR | [2007/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/43] | 30.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2314828 (HUMPHRIES WILLIAM A) [A] * page 3, column RIGHT, lines 50-66; figures 1-14 *; | [A]WO2004082950 (COLOP STEMPELERZEUGUNG SKOPEK [AT], et al) [A] * page 7, lines 13-35; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO2004091923 (DESIGN SHOPPING GMBH [AT], et al) [X] 1,2,14 * page 11, paragraphs 1-4; figures 1-5 *; | [PX]WO2005084953 (COLOP STEMPELERZEUGUNG SKOPEK [AT], et al) [PX] 1-14 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 5; figures 1-3; claim 1 * |