EP1841533 - BASE STABLE IONIC LIQUIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN Northern Ireland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN Northern Ireland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FROHLICH, Ute, c/o The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN / GB | 02 /
HUQ, Susanne, c/o The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN / GB | 03 /
KATDARE, Suhas, c/o The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN / GB | 04 /
LUKASIK, Rafal Marcin, c/o The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN / GB | 05 /
BOGEL, Ewa, c/o The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN / GB | 06 /
PLECHKOVA, Natalia Vladimirovna, c/o The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN / GB | 07 /
SEDDON, Kenneth Richard, c/o The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN / GB | 08 /
EARLE, Martyn John, c/o The Queen's University of Belfast University Road Belfast BT7 1NN / GB | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Hamer, Christopher K., et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06700224.6 | 04.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006GB00021 | Priority number, date | GB20050000028 | 04.01.2005 Original published format: GB 0500028 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006072785 | Date: | 13.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1841533 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/02, C07C209/60, C07C45/69, C07C45/74, C07C45/66, C07C45/67, C07C45/72, C07C45/73, C07C211/62, C07C215/40, C07C217/08, C07C221/00, C07D211/14, C07D231/12, C07D487/08 | [2008/13] | CPC: |
B01J31/0288 (EP,US);
B01J31/02 (KR);
B01J31/0202 (EP,US);
B01J31/0204 (EP,US);
B01J31/0224 (EP,US);
B01J31/0225 (EP,US);
B01J31/0227 (EP,US);
B01J31/0237 (EP,US);
B01J31/0277 (EP,US);
B01J31/0278 (EP,US);
B01J31/0279 (EP,US);
B01J31/0282 (EP,US);
B01J31/0284 (EP,US);
B01J31/0285 (EP,US);
B01J31/0298 (EP,US);
C07C211/63 (EP,US);
C07C215/40 (EP,US);
C07C217/08 (EP,US);
C07C221/00 (EP,US);
C07C313/00 (KR);
C07C45/66 (EP,KR,US);
C07C45/67 (EP,US);
C07C45/72 (EP,US);
C07C45/73 (EP,US);
C07C45/74 (EP,US);
C07D211/14 (EP,US);
C07D231/12 (EP,US);
C07D487/04 (EP,US);
B01J2231/10 (EP,US);
B01J2231/20 (EP,US);
B01J2231/30 (EP,US);
B01J2231/341 (EP,US);
B01J2231/342 (EP,US);
B01J2231/346 (EP,US);
B01J2231/348 (EP,US);
B01J2231/40 (EP,US);
B01J2231/4261 (EP,US);
B01J2231/50 (EP,US);
B01J2231/60 (EP,US);
B01J2231/70 (EP,US);
B01J2531/90 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C221/00, C07C225/12 (US,EP);
C07C45/66, C07C49/203 (US,EP);
C07C45/66, C07C49/637 (US,EP);
C07C45/66, C07C49/647 (US,EP);
C07C45/67, C07C49/597 (EP,US);
C07C45/67, C07C49/603 (US,EP);
C07C45/72, C07C49/17 (EP,US);
C07C45/72, C07C49/493 (EP,US);
C07C45/72, C07C49/497 (EP,US);
C07C45/73, C07C49/403 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [2007/41] | B01J31/02, C07C209/60, C07C45/74 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BASENSTABILE IONISCHE FLÜSSIGKEITEN | [2007/41] | English: | BASE STABLE IONIC LIQUIDS | [2007/41] | French: | LIQUIDES IONIQUES STABLES EN MILIEU BASIQUE | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 27.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | EP10184797.8 / EP2319621 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.06.2008 | 31.01.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]US6552232 (MEHNERT CHRISTIAN PETER [US], et al) [DY] 1,5,14-19 * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 35 * * examples 2,4,9; tables 1,2,5 * * claims 1,2,6-11,14-16 *; | [XIY]WO2004029004 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,5,14,16-19 * pages 42-58; compounds 1D,1E,2B,3C,4C,5A,6A,7B,8B,9A * * examples 1,3-6; tables I,VIII-X,XIV,XIX; compounds 12, ME3NBU.NTF2,19,HEX3PC14H29.NTF2,BU3PME.NTF2,24 * * claims 1-5,8,14,15,17,18,20,21,23,28-30 * [I] 15 [Y] 1,5-8,14-19; | [Y]DE10247578 (SOLVENT INNOVATION GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,5,14-19 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] * * page 9, lines 9,10 * * claims 1,5,18 *; | [XYI]US2004097755 (ABBOTT ANDREW P [GB], et al) [X] 1,5,14,16,18,19 * paragraphs [0051] - [0054]; tables 4-6 * * paragraphs [0072] - [0075]; claims 1,12-16,20,24 * [Y] 17 [I] 6-8,15; | [XY] - WELTON, TOM ET AL, "Palladium catalyzed reactions in ionic liquids", ADVANCES IN ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY , 51, 251-284 CODEN: AOMCAU; ISSN: 0065-3055, (2004), XP009071796 [X] 1,5,14,16,18,19 * pages 257-258 * * pages 261-263 * * pages 271-272 * [Y] 6-8,15,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-3055(03)51006-1 | [XY] - ZOU Y ET AL, "Palladium Catalyzed Suzuki Cross-Coupling Reaction in Molten Tetra-n-butylammonium Bromide", CHINESE JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (2004), vol. 22, pages 215 - 218, XP009072241 [X] 1,5,14,16-19 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8,15 | [XY] - HERRMANN W A ET AL, "Heck reaction catalyzed by phospha-palladacycles in non-aqueous ionic liquids", JOURNAL OF ORGANOMETALLIC CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER-SEQUOIA S.A. LAUSANNE, CH, (19990105), vol. 572, no. 1, ISSN 0022-328X, pages 141 - 145, XP004152860 [X] 1,5,14,16,18,19 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8,15,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-328X(98)00941-3 | [XY] - BOEHM P W ET AL, "NONAQUEOUS IONIC LIQUIDS: SUPERIOR REACTION MEDIA FOR THE CATALYTICHECK-VINYLATION OF CHLOROARENES", CHEMISTRY - A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, VCH PUBLISHERS, US, (200003), vol. 6, no. 6, ISSN 0947-6539, pages 1017 - 1025, XP002901206 [X] 1,5,14,16,18,19 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8,15,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-3765(20000317)6:6<1017::AID-CHEM1017>3.0.CO;2-8 | [XY] - PEROSA A ET AL, "Heck reaction catalyzed by Pd/C, in a triphasic?organic/Aliquat 336/aqueous?solvent system", ORGANIC & BIOMOLECULAR CHEMISTRY, (20040714), vol. 2, no. 15, pages 2249 - 2252, XP002400791 [X] 1,5,14,16-19 * the whole document * * see in particular Tb. 1, entries 2, 7; Tb.5, entry 1 * [Y] 6-8,15,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b406822j | [XY] - CALO V ET AL, "Pd Nanoparticles Catalyzed stereospecific Synthesis of beta-Aryl Cinnamic Esters in Ionic Liquids", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20030311), vol. 68, no. 7, pages 2929 - 2933, XP002400792 [X] 1,5,14,16,18,19 * page 2930; table 1 * [Y] 6-8,15,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo026877t | [XY] - CALO V ET AL, "PD NANOPARTICLE CATALYZED HECK ARYLATION OF 1,1-DISUBSTITUTED ALKENES IN IONIC LIQUIDS. STUDY ON FACTORS AFFECTING THE REGIOSELECTIVITY OF THE COUPLING PROCESS", ORGANOMETALLICS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20031013), vol. 22, no. 21, ISSN 0276-7333, pages 4193 - 4197, XP001189815 [X] 1,5,14,16,18,19 * page 4195; table 1 * [Y] 6-8,15,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om034020w | [XY] - KAUFMANN ET AL., "Molten Salts as an Efficient Medium for Palladium Catalyzed C-C Coupling Reactions", SYNLETT, (1996), pages 1091 - 1092, XP002400793 [X] 1,5,14,16,18,19 * the whole document * [Y] 6-8,15,17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1996-5658 | [Y] - BLASS B E, "KF/Al2O3 Mediated organic synthesis", TETRAHEDRON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20021111), vol. 58, no. 46, ISSN 0040-4020, pages 9301 - 9320, XP004391672 [Y] 1,17-19 * page 9301 * * page 9304 * * page 9309 - page 9315 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4020(02)00992-4 |