EP1838593 - COHERENT ARRANGEMENT OF ELASTIC FIXING ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/40] | ELASTIC FIXING ELEMENT, AND COHERENT ARRANGEMENT OF SUCH ELEMENTS | ||
[2011/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ghent-Supply Rozenstraat 9 9810 Eke-Nazareth / BE | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSMANS, Frank Zuiderbiesten 11 B-9810 Eke / BE | 02 /
BOSMANS, Jan Gaverlandwegel 35 B-9120 Melsele / BE | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Balesta, Pierre, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie Immeuble Eurocentre 179 Boulevard de Turin 59777 Lille / FR | [2012/17] |
Former [2007/40] | Hennion, Jean-Claude, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 27bis, rue du Vieux Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 06700279.0 | 04.01.2006 | [2007/40] | WO2006EP00028 | Priority number, date | FR20050000513 | 18.01.2005 Original published format: FR 0500513 | [2007/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006077011 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1838593 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1838593 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B65D63/10, A01G17/08 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
A01G17/08 (EP);
A01G17/085 (US);
Y10T24/141 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1498 (EP,US);
Y10T24/15 (EP,US);
Y10T24/44641 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOHÄRENTE ANORDNUNG VON ELASTISCHEN BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENTEN | [2011/24] | English: | COHERENT ARRANGEMENT OF ELASTIC FIXING ELEMENTS | [2011/02] | French: | ENSEMBLE COHERENT D'ELEMENTS ELASTIQUES DE FIXATION | [2011/24] |
Former [2007/40] | ELASTISCHES BEFESTIGUNGSELEMENT UND KOHÄRENTE ANORDNUNG SOLCHER ELEMENTE | ||
Former [2007/40] | ELASTIC FIXING ELEMENT, AND COHERENT ARRANGEMENT OF SUCH ELEMENTS | ||
Former [2007/40] | ELEMENT ELASTIQUE DE FIXATION ET ENSEMBLE COHERENT DE TELS ELEMENTS | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.10.2010 | 13.10.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2006 | AT | 15.06.2011 | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | IE | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | PL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | LU | 04.01.2012 | BE | 31.01.2012 | CH | 31.01.2012 | LI | 31.01.2012 | MC | 31.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
LU | 04.01.2012 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.01.2012 | ||
LI | 31.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
IE | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
SE | 15.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2943371 (PATTERSON HERMAN W); | [A]US3048906 (PATTERSON HERMAN W); | [A]US3673639 (DRISCOLL ROSEMARY F); | [A]US5081746 (CZWARTACKI EDWARD J [US]); | [DA]US5893456 (BOSMANS JAN [BE]) [DA] 1,4 * column 4, line 34 - column 5, line 6; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US6044526 (PUTNEY MARILYN [US]) |