EP1856600 - METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING SEVERAL DOCUMENT PROCESSING JOBS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.01.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 05.02.2014 [2014/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Océ Printing Systems GmbH & Co. KG Siemensallee 2 85586 Poing / DE | [2013/37] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states Océ Printing Systems GmbH Siemensallee 2 85586 Poing / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEUX, Jean-Marc Christian Alfred Rue Emile Godfrind 48 B-5300 Andenne / BE | 02 /
VONS, Johan Geert 17 Bis Rue Des Arts F-94170 Le Perreux Sur Marne / FR | 03 /
SCHWIER, Hartwig Regina-Ullmann-strasse 43 81927 München / DE | 04 /
STODERSCHNIG, Albin Rehbergstrasse 5a 81479 München / DE | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Schaumburg und Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstraße 31 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/47] | Schaumburg, Thoenes, Thurn, Landskron Patentanwälte Postfach 86 07 48 81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06700600.7 | 20.01.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006EP50338 | Priority number, date | DE20051003130 | 21.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005003130 | DE20051061605 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: DE102005061605 | [2007/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006077246 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1856600 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
G06F3/1212 (EP,US);
G06F3/126 (EP,US);
G06F3/1275 (EP,US);
G06F3/1285 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/18] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, COMPUTERPROGRAMM UND SYSTEM ZUM BEARBEITEN VON MEHREREN DOKUMENTENVERARBEITUNGSAUFTRÄGEN | [2007/47] | English: | METHOD, COMPUTER PROGRAM, AND SYSTEM FOR PROCESSING SEVERAL DOCUMENT PROCESSING JOBS | [2007/47] | French: | PROCEDE, PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE ET SYSTEME POUR TRAITER PLUSIEURS ORDRES DE TRAITEMENT DE DOCUMENTS | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 28.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.10.2013 | 16.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/06] | 26.09.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/06] | 04.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6529286 (KING EDWARD WINSLOW [US]) [X] 1,2,5-16,27,52-54,56-61 * figure 3 * * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * column 2, line 8 - line 28 * * column 5, line 7 - line 25 * * column 5, line 50 - line 67 * [Y] 3,4,55; | [XY]US2002089687 (FERLITSCH ANDREW RODNEY [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,8,52,53,55,60 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0057] * [Y] 3,4,55; | [XY]US5287194 (LOBIONDO MARTIN F [US]) [X] 1,17-22,28-31,38,39,42,52,53 * column 1, line 7 - line 12 * * column 3, line 27 - line 56 * * column 4, line 46 - line 50 * * column 5, line 12 - line 44 * * column 5, line 63 - line 68; figure 2 * * column 6, line 22 - line 27 * [Y] 40,41,43-51; | [Y]US2002138631 (FRIEDEL GUY [US], et al) [Y] 40,41,43-51 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0060] *; | [A]DE10027222 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 6,9,10,38,58,61 * column 1, line 3 - line 7 * * column 3, line 38 - line 43 * * column 4, line 54 - line 56 * * column 7, line 61 - line 66 * * column 8, line 4 - line 21 *; | [A]US5450593 (HOWELL WILLIAM E [US], et al) [A] 38-51 * column 1, line 55 - line 58 * * column 8, line 45 - column 10, line 41; figure 6 *; | [A]US2003231328 (CHAPIN DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 44 * paragraph [0015] * | by applicant | US5287194 | US2002089687 | US2002138631 | DE10027222 | US2003231328 | US5265221 | US2004049684 | US6587861 |