EP1844403 - ICONIC COMMUNICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.12.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zlango Ltd. 3 Tvuot HaAretz Street 69546 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORCH, Yoav 14 Bustenai Street 47302 Ramat Hasharon / IL | 02 /
SPIEGEL, Ehud 62 Hafetz Haim Street 49350 Petach Tikva / IL | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [2012/47] |
Former [2008/45] | Machtalère, Georges, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2007/42] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 06700648.6 | 16.01.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006IL00061 | Priority number, date | IL20050166322 | 16.01.2005 Original published format: IL 16632205 | US20050644021P | 18.01.2005 Original published format: US 644021 P | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006075334 | Date: | 20.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1844403 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F17/00, G06F15/00, G06F3/00, G06F9/44, H04M13/00, H04H1/00, G09G5/00, G06T13/00 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
H04M1/72439 (EP,US);
G06F3/04817 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDZEICHENKOMMUNIKATION | [2007/42] | English: | ICONIC COMMUNICATION | [2007/42] | French: | COMMUNICATION ICONIQUE | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2007 | Search fee paid | 31.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 09.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/02] | 29.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/02] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6044248 (MOCHIZUKI YASUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-55 * column 4, line 37 - column 5, line 20; figures 2-4 * * column 6, line 12 - line 22; figure 6 ** column 6, line 45 - column 7, line 28; figure 7 *; | [Y]EP1215867 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-55 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0025]; figures 2-5 *; | [Y]US2003045355 (COMAIR CLAUDE [US]) [Y] 1-55 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0015]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0018]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0024]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figure 5 * | International search | [Y]US5880731 (LILES CHRISTOPHER A [US], et al); | [Y]US6022222 (GUINAN MARY BETH [US]); | [Y]US6167441 (HIMMEL MARIA AZUA [US]); | [Y]US2003084121 (DE BOOR ADAM [US], et al) |