EP1838978 - TIMING BELT TENSIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litens Automotive Partnership 730 Rowntree Dairy Road Woodbridge, Ontario L4L 5T7 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Litens Automotive Partnership 730 Rowntree Dairy Road Woodbridge Ontario L4L 5T9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEPNIAK, Jacek 533 Mapleview Drive Innisfil, Ontario L9S 2Z4 / CA | 02 /
LEHTOVAARA, Joma, J. 1330 Mississauga Ontario L5A 3T1 / CA | 03 /
FRANKOWSKI, Marek 2277 Somers Blvd. Innisfil, Ontario L9S 2E6 / CA | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06701107.2 | 18.01.2006 | [2007/40] | WO2006CA00057 | Priority number, date | US20050645855P | 19.01.2005 Original published format: US 645855 P | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006076799 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1838978 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1838978 | Date: | 08.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 27.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16H7/12 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
F16H7/1281 (EP,US);
F16H2007/081 (EP,US);
F16H2007/0846 (EP,US);
F16H2007/0878 (EP,US);
F16H2007/088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/17] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERRIEMENSPANNER | [2007/40] | English: | TIMING BELT TENSIONER | [2007/40] | French: | TENDEUR DE COURROIE DE DISTRIBUTION | [2007/40] | Entry into regional phase | 25.06.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.06.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5470279 (BRANDENSTEIN MANFRED [DE], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 9; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6196940 (LEHTOVAARA JORMA J [CA]) [A] 1-20 * figures 4,5 *; | [A]US6375588 (FRANKOWSKI MAREK [CA], et al) [A] 1-20* figure 7 *; | [A]US2003017894 (KAISER JORG [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * figure 4 * | International search | [Y]CA2469497 (LITENS AUTOMOTIVE [CA]); | [Y]US4767383 (ST JOHN RICHARD C [US]); | [Y]US5064405 (ST JOHN RICHARD C [US]) | by applicant | US6149542 | US5470279 |