EP1842409 - ENERGY SAVING TELECOMMUNICATIONS SHELTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Petcor H/M Erga - Efarmoges Klimatismou S.A. 67, Dimokratias Street 175 63 P. Faliro, Athens / GR | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PETRATOS, Gerasimos 67, Dimokratias Street GR- 175 63 P.Faliro, Athens / GR | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Papaconstantinou, Helen, et al Dr. Helen Papaconstantinou John Filias and Associates 2, Coumbari Street Kolonaki 106 74 Athens / GR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Papaconstantinou, Helen, et al Dr. Helen Papaconstantinou John Filias and Associates 2, Coumbari Street Kolonaki 106 74 Athens / GR | Application number, filing date | 06701411.8 | 26.01.2006 | [2007/41] | WO2006GR00003 | Priority number, date | GR20050100039 | 27.01.2005 Original published format: GR 20050100039 | [2007/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006079855 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1842409 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
H05K7/186 (EP);
E04H1/1205 (GR);
E04H5/02 (GR,US);
E04H1/1238 (EP);
E04H5/04 (EP);
H02B1/565 (GR);
H05K7/20 (GR);
H05K7/2069 (EP);
H05K7/207 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENERGIESPARENDE TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSUNTERBRINGUNG | [2007/41] | English: | ENERGY SAVING TELECOMMUNICATIONS SHELTER | [2007/41] | French: | ABRI ECONOMISEUR D'ENERGIE POUR DU MATERIEL DE TELECOMMUNICATIONS | [2007/41] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 01.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2008 | 31.01.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5469328 (PALASZEWSKI STEPHEN J [US]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 9 - line 11 * * column 1, line 51 - column 2, line 52 ** figures 1-3 *; | [Y]EP1154509 (MARCONI COMM INC [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1-4 *; | [Y]US2005011199 (GRISHAM JOHN N [US], et al) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0044] * * claim 1 * * figures 1-4 * |