EP1844525 - ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tyco Electronics UK Limited Faraday Road, Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BARNETT, Gary 36 Money Hill, Ashby De La Zouch Leicestershire LE65 1JH / GB | [2007/42] | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/27] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2007/42] | Cooper, Simon Mark, et al Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham, Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB | Application number, filing date | 06704465.1 | 27.01.2006 | [2007/42] | WO2006GB50022 | Priority number, date | GB20050002319 | 04.02.2005 Original published format: GB 0502319 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006082449 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1844525 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1844525 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/50, H01R11/26, H01R43/00 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
H01R43/00 (EP,US);
H01R11/26 (EP,US);
H01R4/5025 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER STECKVERBINDER | [2007/42] | English: | ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR | [2007/42] | French: | CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2007/42] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/42] | 16.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.07.2009 | BE | 22.07.2009 | CY | 22.07.2009 | CZ | 22.07.2009 | DK | 22.07.2009 | EE | 22.07.2009 | FI | 22.07.2009 | IT | 22.07.2009 | LT | 22.07.2009 | LV | 22.07.2009 | NL | 22.07.2009 | PL | 22.07.2009 | RO | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | SI | 22.07.2009 | SK | 22.07.2009 | TR | 22.07.2009 | BG | 22.10.2009 | GR | 23.10.2009 | ES | 02.11.2009 | IS | 22.11.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | HU | 23.01.2010 | LU | 27.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | FR | 01.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CY | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
LU | 27.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CY | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CY | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB142175 (HENRY GARDE, et al) [X] 1-5,8,10,13,16-27,30-34,37* the whole document *; | [X]GB261573 (CHARLES FREDERICK CLARE) [X] 1-13,16-20,22-27,30-33,37,38 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0840421 (SEKKO AB OY [FI]) [X] 1-13,16-34,37,38 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1237227 (SICAME ELECTRICAL DEV LTD [GB]) [X] 1-5,8,10-37 * the whole document *; | [X]US6848934 (MCCARTHY DALE C [US]) [X] 1-5,8,10-13,16-27,30-34,37 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB142175 | GB261573 | EP0840421 | EP1237227 | US6848934 |