EP1848336 - DETECTION AND MONITORING OF STRESS EVENTS DURING SLEEP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.01.2015 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Widemed Ltd. P.O. Box 12117 46733 Herzlia / IL | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REISFELD, Daniel 12 Meir Margalit Street 69401 Tel-Aviv / IL | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Howard, Paul Nicholas, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2007/44] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06704643.3 | 07.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006IL00148 | Priority number, date | US20050651295P | 07.02.2005 Original published format: US 651295 P | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006082589 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1848336 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/08, A61B5/02 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
A61B5/0205 (EP,US);
A61B5/0816 (EP,US);
A61B5/318 (EP);
A61B5/33 (US);
A61B5/4818 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ERFASSUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON STRESS-EREIGNISSEN WÄHREND DES SCHLAFS | [2007/44] | English: | DETECTION AND MONITORING OF STRESS EVENTS DURING SLEEP | [2007/44] | French: | DETECTION ET SURVEILLANCE DES EVENEMENTS DE STRESS AU COURS DU SOMMEIL | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 23.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/07] | 30.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2014 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5385144 (YAMANISHI AKIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,13-17,22-27,35-39 * column 2, line 39 - column 4, line 24 * * column 5, lines 10-28 * [Y] 7,18,28,40-42; | [XY]WO9616591 (AIHONEN JUKKA [FI], et al) [X] 43,44 * page 6, line 19 - page 8, line 14 *[Y] 7,18,28,40-42; | [A]US2001018557 (LYNN LAWRENCE A [US], et al) [A] 8-12,30-34 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0134] * | International search | [A]US4777962 (WATSON HERMAN [US], et al); | [X]US5803066 (RAPOPORT DAVID M [US], et al); | [A]US6375623 (GAVRIELY NOAM [IL]) |