EP1858646 - IMPULSE CENTRIFUGE FOR CLEANING THE LUBRICATING OIL OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hengst GmbH & Co. KG Nienkamp 55 - 85 48147 Münster / DE | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEINIG, Uwe Renhardsweilerstr. 13/1 88348 Bad Saulgau / DE | 02 /
BAUMANN, Dieter Überwasserstrasse 10 48268 Greven / DE | 03 /
GROSSE WIESMANN, Karl Erlenstrasse 7 48301 Nottuln / DE | [2008/14] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
MEINIG, Uwe Hägerstr. 274 48161 Münster / DE | ||
02 /
BAUMANN, Dieter Überwasserstrasse 10 48268 Greven / DE | |||
03 /
GROSSE WIESMANN, Karl Erlenstrasse 7 48301 Nottuln / DE | Representative(s) | Linnemann, Winfried, et al Schulze Horn & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Voßgasse 3 48143 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Linnemann, Winfried, et al Schulze Horn & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 01 52 48050 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 06704663.1 | 11.01.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006EP00159 | Priority number, date | DE20052000756U | 18.01.2005 Original published format: DE 202005000756 U | [2007/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006077033 | Date: | 27.07.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1858646 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.07.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1858646 | Date: | 02.09.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/00 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
B04B7/08 (EP);
B04B5/005 (EP);
F01M2001/1035 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FREISTRAHL ZENTRIFUGE FÜR DIE REINIGUNG DES SCHMIERÖLS EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2007/48] | English: | IMPULSE CENTRIFUGE FOR CLEANING THE LUBRICATING OIL OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2007/48] | French: | CENTRIFUGEUSE A JET LIBRE AU NETTOYAGE DE L'HUILE LUBRIFIANTE D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 26.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 26.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 02.09.2009 | CY | 02.09.2009 | CZ | 02.09.2009 | DK | 02.09.2009 | EE | 02.09.2009 | FI | 02.09.2009 | IE | 02.09.2009 | IT | 02.09.2009 | LT | 02.09.2009 | LV | 02.09.2009 | NL | 02.09.2009 | PL | 02.09.2009 | RO | 02.09.2009 | SE | 02.09.2009 | SI | 02.09.2009 | SK | 02.09.2009 | TR | 02.09.2009 | GR | 03.12.2009 | ES | 13.12.2009 | IS | 02.01.2010 | PT | 04.01.2010 | GB | 11.01.2010 | LU | 11.01.2010 | BE | 31.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | FR | 01.02.2010 | HU | 03.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | BG | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
GB | 11.01.2010 | ||
LU | 11.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
GB | 11.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
HU | 03.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 02.09.2009 | |
CY | 02.09.2009 | ||
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
GB | 11.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
IT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
GB | 11.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
GB | 11.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2011/04] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
GR | 03.12.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
FR | 01.02.2010 | ||
Former [2010/41] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
DK | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
CZ | 02.09.2009 | ||
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
RO | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
SK | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
IS | 02.01.2010 | ||
PT | 04.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
EE | 02.09.2009 | ||
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
IE | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
ES | 13.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | CY | 02.09.2009 | |
FI | 02.09.2009 | ||
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | FI | 02.09.2009 | |
LT | 02.09.2009 | ||
LV | 02.09.2009 | ||
NL | 02.09.2009 | ||
PL | 02.09.2009 | ||
SE | 02.09.2009 | ||
SI | 02.09.2009 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE1131600 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER) [Y] 28* the whole document *; | [YA]DE1151222 (MANN & HUMMEL FILTER) [Y] 23,29 * the whole document * [A] 15,16; | [Y]US6224531 (FREHLAND PETER [DE], et al) [Y] 9,10,12,15-19,24,31,32 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP1287895 (FLEETGUARD INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9-14,16,23,26,27,29,30,32,33 * paragraphs [0012] , [0027]; figures 2,3,5-13 * [Y] 21,23,27,28; | [XY]EP1340547 (FLEETGUARD INC [US]) [X] 1,3-7,16,21,23,24,26-29 * paragraphs [0013] - [0029]; figures 1-5 * [Y] 9,10,12,15-19,24,29,31,32; | [Y]DE20214709U (HENGST GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 9,10 * abstract *; | [Y]DE10334762 (FLEETGUARD INC [US]) [Y] 21,23,27 * abstract *; | [X]DE102004005920 (FLEETGUARD INC [US]) [X] 1,3,6,8,26,27,31,32 * abstract * |