EP1867215 - A POWER SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.01.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAP-XX Limited Level 3 685 Pittwater Road Dee Why NSW 2099 / AU | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SMITH, Trevor Units 9 & 10, 12 Mars Road Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU | 02 /
MARS, Pierre Units 9 & 10, 12 Mars Road Lane Cove, NSW 2066 / AU | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Horner, David Richard D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06704807.4 | 02.02.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006AU00126 | Priority number, date | AU20050900458 | 02.02.2005 Original published format: AU 2005900458 | AU20050901197 | 11.03.2005 Original published format: AU 2005901197 | AU20050904262 | 08.08.2005 Original published format: AU 2005904262 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006081613 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1867215 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 10.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, G03B15/05, H02M9/04, H02M3/158, H02J7/34, H02M1/00 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
H02M3/1582 (EP,US);
H02M3/1584 (EP,US);
H02J7/345 (EP,US);
H02M1/007 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/51] | H05B37/02, G03B15/05, H02M9/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/19] |
Former [2007/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMVERSORGUNG | [2007/51] | English: | A POWER SUPPLY | [2007/51] | French: | ALIMENTATION ELECTRIQUE | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2007 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 25.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.01.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0513920 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [Y] 19,20 * abstract * * column 1, lines 3-8 * * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 9 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 53 * * column 25, lines 25-53; claim 1 *; | [XY]US2002067143 (ROBINETT MARK I [US], et al) [X] 18 * page 1, paragraph 3; figure 1 * * page 1, paragraph 13 - page 3, paragraph 26 * * page 4, paragraphs 53-55 * [Y] 1-17,19,20; | [A]DE10147235 (MERLAKU KASTRIOT [DE]) [A] 1-20* the whole document *; | [A]WO03073161 (CONCORD CAMERA CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003180037 (SOMMERS MATHEW [US]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004077597 (TOCAD ENERGY CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US6737830 (BEAN HEATHER N [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2004233714 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1467417 (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS [JP]) [Y] 1-17 * column 1, paragraph 6 *; | [A]WO2004100624 (COLOR KINETICS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO2004100624 (COLOR KINETICS INC [US], et al); | [Y]EP1467417 (CITIZEN ELECTRONICS [JP]); | [Y]WO03073161 (CONCORD CAMERA CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2003180037 (SOMMERS MATHEW [US]); | [Y]US6737830 (BEAN HEATHER N [US], et al); | [Y]JP2004077597 ; | [Y]JP2004233714 ; | [Y]JP2005173168 ; | [A]DE10147235 (MERLAKU KASTRIOT [DE]) | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 27, Database accession no. 2004-288186, XP008114379 & JP2004077597 A 20040311 (TOCAD ENERGY CO LTD) | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 61, Database accession no. 2004-628526, XP008114380 & JP2004233714 A 20040819 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 51, Database accession no. 2005-499922, XP008114381 & JP2005173168 A 20050630 (CANON INC.) |