EP1859185 - A PORTAL APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ITS USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asiaworld Shipping Services Pty Ltd Level 2, 403 Pacific Highway Artarmon, New South Wales 2064 / AU | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IVANINE, Serguei 9/106 Pacific Parade Dee Why, New South Wales 2099 / AU | 02 /
BRASH, Kenneth George 67 Morrison Avenue Wombarra, New South Wales 2515 / AU | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06704934.6 | 01.03.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006AU00259 | Priority number, date | AU20050900953 | 01.03.2005 Original published format: AU 2005900953 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006092008 | Date: | 08.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1859185 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1859185 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16L3/00, A01M13/00, F17D1/04, F16K11/10, F16L5/02 | [2011/10] | CPC: |
A01M13/003 (EP,US);
F16L3/00 (KR);
A01M13/00 (EP,KR,US);
F16L5/02 (EP,US);
F17D1/04 (KR);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/48] | F16L3/00, A01M13/00, F17D1/04, F16K11/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | PORTALVORRICHTUNG UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/48] | English: | A PORTAL APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR ITS USE | [2007/48] | French: | PORTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE D'UTILISATION | [2013/01] |
Former [2007/48] | PORTIQUE ET SON PROCEDE D UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 24.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.12.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 24.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 02.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13150528.1 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 09.02.2013 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.03.2006 | AT | 09.01.2013 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | PL | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SK | 09.01.2013 | TR | 09.01.2013 | IE | 01.03.2013 | LU | 01.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 01.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
CY | 09.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3837560 (PROSANITAS GES FUER VORRATSSCH [DE]) [Y] 15,16,18-38 * column 1, line 1 - line 1 * * column 3, line 36 - line 62 * * column 4, line 31 - column 5, line 4 * * figures 1,3 *; | [XA]US5094273 (EAGLETON ANTHONY C [AU]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * column 1, line 23 - line 45 * * figures 6-11 * [A] 3-5,9-38; | [A]US5641463 (LANGHART CHRIS [US]) [A] 1-38* abstract *; | [XYI]EP0895012 (ELF ANTAR FRANCE [FR]) [X] 1-8,10-14,17 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0024] - [0026] - [0030]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 15,16,18-38 [I] 9 | International search | [X]JPH04203599 ; | [X]JPH06281075 ; | [X]JPH03111286 ; | [X]JPH11169053 ; | [X]JPH10156139 ; | [X]US90336 ; | [Y]US4200657 (COOK JAMES S [US]); | [X]FR2487638 (CABROL LUCIEN [FR]); | [X]EP0068724 (NEW ZEALAND APPLE AND PEAR MAR [NZ]); | [Y]US5417921 (DOVE ROBERT L [US], et al); | [Y]US5641463 (LANGHART CHRIS [US]); | [X]US5755527 (DUFRESNE PETER [US]); | [X]US5785086 (BOYCE J STEPHEN [US], et al); | [X]US6202565 (HENRY STEPHEN K [US]); | [X]US6252164 (WISE ERIC P [US]); | [X]US6513282 (SCHOTT ROBERT JEFFREY [US], et al); | [X]DE10314881 (HIENDL HELMUT [DE]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 016, no. 545, & JP04203599 A 19920724 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1995, no. 01, & JP06281075 A 19941007 (YOSHITAKE:KK) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 015, no. 303, & JP03111286 A 19910513 (HITACHI PLANT ENG & CONSTR CO LTD) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1999, no. 11, & JP11169053 A 19990629 (CHISSO CORP) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10156139 A 19980616 (HITACHI PLANT ENG & CONSTR CO LTD) |