EP1724972 - A SERVICE REROUTING TRIGGERING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Buji Bantian Longang District Shenzhen 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUN, Junbai, Huawei Administration Bld. Bantian, Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Yu, Huawei Administration Bld. Bantian, Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
FENG, Junjie, Huawei Administration Bld. Bantian, Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Skuhra, Udo ATTENTION: ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/47] | Skuhra, Udo Reinhard-Skuhra-Weise & Partner GbR Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06705567.3 | 25.01.2006 | [2006/47] | WO2006CN00146 | Priority number, date | CN2005133025 | 25.01.2005 Original published format: CN200510033025 | [2006/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006079286 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | ZH | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1724972 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1724972 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 03.08.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H04L45/02 (EP);
H04L45/22 (EP);
H04L45/28 (EP);
H04L45/32 (EP);
H04L45/62 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/47] | H04L12/437, H04B10/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/47] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIENST-UMLEIT-TRIGGER-VERFAHREN | [2006/47] | English: | A SERVICE REROUTING TRIGGERING METHOD | [2006/47] | French: | PROCEDE D'ENCLENCHEMENT D'UN REROUTAGE DE SERVICE | [2006/47] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2006 | Translation filed | 15.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 15.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 18.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.05.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/28] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.06.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2008 | BE | 30.07.2008 | CY | 30.07.2008 | CZ | 30.07.2008 | DK | 30.07.2008 | EE | 30.07.2008 | FI | 30.07.2008 | IT | 30.07.2008 | LT | 30.07.2008 | LV | 30.07.2008 | NL | 30.07.2008 | PL | 30.07.2008 | RO | 30.07.2008 | SI | 30.07.2008 | SK | 30.07.2008 | TR | 30.07.2008 | BG | 30.10.2008 | SE | 30.10.2008 | GR | 31.10.2008 | IS | 30.11.2008 | PT | 30.12.2008 | IE | 25.01.2009 | LU | 25.01.2009 | HU | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
LU | 25.01.2009 | ||
HU | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
LU | 25.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2011/04] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
GR | 31.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
PL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
SE | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
IE | 25.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/03] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
IT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/29] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
EE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
RO | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
SK | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
DK | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
BE | 30.07.2008 | ||
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/15] | AT | 30.07.2008 | |
FI | 30.07.2008 | ||
LT | 30.07.2008 | ||
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
SI | 30.07.2008 | ||
BG | 30.10.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
PT | 30.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
LV | 30.07.2008 | ||
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 30.07.2008 | |
NL | 30.07.2008 | ||
IS | 30.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2001019540 (UEMATSU KUMIKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10* paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0214] *; | [A]EP1217789 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0136] *; | [X]US2002163686 (BISCHOFF MATHIAS [DE], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0095] *; | [A]EP1422968 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0037] * | International search | [A]US5442620 (KREMER WILHELM [US]); | [A]JP2002118580 (NEC CORP); | [A]CN1424827 (UNIV SHANGHAI COMMUNICATION [CN]); | [A]CN1472890 (ZHONGXING COMM CO LTD SHENZHEN [CN]) |