EP1866484 - TOWER FOUNDATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING SUCH SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026-1215 / US | ||
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states Densit A/S Rordalsvej 44 9200 Aalborg Ø / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSEN, Anders, Møller Nordre Strandvej 6 DK-9480 Løkken / DK | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Application number, filing date | 06706122.6 | 16.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006DK00152 | Priority number, date | DK20050000383 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: DK 200500383 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006097108 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866484 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | E02D27/42 | [2007/51] | CPC: |
E02D27/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TURMFUNDAMENTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG SOLCH EINES SYSTEMS | [2007/51] | English: | TOWER FOUNDATION SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR PROVIDING SUCH SYSTEM | [2007/51] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FONDATION DE TOUR ET PROCÉDÉ POUR METTRE À DISPOSITION UN TEL SYSTÈME | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/25] | 22.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/25] | Divisional application(s) | EP11178654.7 / EP2390421 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAY]BE569016 (ELEKTRIZITATS A G) [X] 1,1,1 * figure 2 * * figure 2 * * figure 2 * [A] 2,10-18,24,26,2,10-18,24,26,2,10-18,24,26 [Y] 19,23,25,19,23,25,19,23,25; | [XA]DK117336B (STENQUIST T [SE]) [X] 1,1,1 * figures 1-3; claim 1 * * figures 1-3; claim 1 * * figures 1-3; claim 1 * [A] 19,19,19; | [X]AU443598B (TRANSFIELD PTY.LIMITED) [X] 1,1,1 * figures 1-3 * * figures 1-3 * * figures 1-3 *; | [YA]EP0518777 (BOUYGUES SA [FR]) [Y] 19,23,25,19,23,25,19,23,25 * claim 1 * * claim 1 * * claim 1 * [A] 3-9,20-22,3-9,20-22,3-9,20-22; | [A]US2002124502 (HENDERSON ALLAN P [US]) [A] 1-26,1-26,1-26 * figures 1-10 * * figures 1-10 * * figures 1-10 *; | [A]JPH0483064 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19920703), vol. 016, no. 302, Database accession no. (M - 1275), & JP04083064 A 19920317 (KAJIMA CORP; others: 01) [A] 1,19,1,19,1,19 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * | by applicant | FR2682982 | US4716696 |