EP1893384 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GRINDING CERAMIC SPHERES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Atlantic GmbH Gartenstrasse 7-17 53229 Bonn / DE | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PÖTZSCH, Michael Burggasse 7 53757 St. Augustin / DE | 02 /
KARB, Walter Judenhof 14 97525 Schwebheim / DE | 03 /
HAUBERT, Michael Sandorfstr. 13 53225 Bonn / DE | 04 /
STOCK, Karl-Otto Am Scherenstück 79 53757 St. Augustin / DE | 05 /
WEBER, Marco Schellenhofweg 2 50858 Köln / DE | [2008/18] |
Former [2008/10] | 01 /
PÖTZSCH, Michael Burggasse 7 53757 St. Augustin / DE | ||
02 /
KARB, Walter Judenhof 14 97525 Schwebheim / DE | |||
03 /
HAUBERT, Michael Sandorfstr. 13 53225 Bonn / DE | |||
04 /
STOCK, Karl-Otto Am Scherenstück 79 53757 St. Augustin / DE | |||
05 /
WEBER, Marco Auf der Weide 15a 52134 Herzogenrath / DE | Representative(s) | Lenzing Gerber Stute PartG von Patentanwälten m.b.B. Bahnstraße 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | Lenzing Gerber Stute Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Bahnstraße 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2010/09] | Lenzing Gerber Stute Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Bahnstraße 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | LENZING GERBER Patentanwälte Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06706173.9 | 06.01.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006EP00075 | Priority number, date | DE20051004038 | 27.01.2005 Original published format: DE102005004038 | [2008/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006079444 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893384 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893384 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B24B11/06 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
B24B11/06 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHLEIFEN VON KERAMISCHEN KUGELN | [2008/10] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR GRINDING CERAMIC SPHERES | [2008/10] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR RECTIFIER DES SPHERES EN CERAMIQUE | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 09.11.2007 | Examination requested [2010/14] | 29.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.08.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.12.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 15.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 09.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2008 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 09.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 09.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.01.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 25.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.01.2006 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | ES | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.01.2006 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.01.2006 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
ES | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6596395 (MURAMATSU KATSUTOSHI [JP]) [X] 1-3 * column 8, line 24 - column 9, line 39; figure 1 *; | [DXY]JPH0542467 ; | [DY]US6171179 (CHIOU YUANG-CHERNG [TW], et al) [DY] 12 * column 2, lines 45-63; figure 1 *; | [A]US3551125 (HALLEWELL RAYMOND T) | [DXY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930625), vol. 017, no. 336, Database accession no. (M - 1435), & JP05042467 A 19930223 (TOSHIBA TUNGALOY CO LTD) [DX] 11,13 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] * [Y] 12 |