EP1851170 - PROCESS AND PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SULPHURIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Rauhalanpuisto 9 02230 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2013/42] | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Puolikkotie 10 02230 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Outotec Oyj Riihitontuntie 7 02200 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAUM, Karl-Heinz Lennebergstrasse 17 55124 Mainz / DE | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Keil & Schaafhausen Patentanwälte PartGmbB Bockenheimer Landstraße 25 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 2-6 60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN Patentanwälte Cronstettenstrasse 66 60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 06706875.9 | 11.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006EP01260 | Priority number, date | DE20051008109 | 21.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005008109 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006087150 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1851170 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1851170 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/76 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
C01B17/806 (EP,US);
C01B17/76 (EP,US);
C01B17/7655 (EP,US);
Y02P20/129 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2008/22] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ANLAGE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHWEFELSÄURE | [2007/45] | English: | PROCESS AND PLANT FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SULPHURIC ACID | [2007/45] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION DESTINES A LA PRODUCTION D'ACIDE SULFURIQUE | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 25.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19522927 (SUED CHEMIE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,19,20 * figure 4; claim -; table . *; | [A]US3490868 (FURKERT HERBERT) [A] 1-24 * column 3, line 28 - line 32; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9114651 (MONSANTO CO [US]) [A] 1 * page 15, paragraph LAST - page 16, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [A]US4996038 (MCALISTER DONALD R [US], et al) [A] 1 * columns 7,8; figures 1,5 *; | [A]DE3000599 (BIPROKWAS); | [A]US6279514 (BROWDER TIMOTHY J [US], et al) |