EP1848631 - ARRANGEMENT OF LINE CONNECTIONS FOR INSTALLATIONS IN AN AIRCRAFT PASSENGER CABIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2010/38] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GONNSEN, Johannes Biernatzkistrasse 7 22767 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
FOKKEN, Markus Wolsteinkamp 76 22607 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
DUPONT, Michael Klein Flottbeker Weg 78A 22605 Hamburg / DE | 04 /
HARRIEHAUSEN, Michael Höxterstrasse 11 22529 Hamburg / DE | 05 /
LEHMANN, Lars Sülldorfer Mühlenweg 36 22589 Hamburg / DE | 06 /
SCHEEL, Marc Krönenbarg 1G 21077 Hamburg / DE | 07 /
REPP, Stefan Eimsbütteler Str. 139 22769 Hamburg / DE | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | Kopf, Korbinian Paul Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06706946.8 | 14.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006EP01340 | Priority number, date | DE20051007058 | 15.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005007058 | US20050653699P | 17.02.2005 Original published format: US 653699 P | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006087168 | Date: | 24.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1848631 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1848631 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/00, B64D11/02, B64D11/04 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B64D11/00 (EP,US);
B64D11/02 (EP,US);
B64D11/04 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2008/11] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEITUNGSVERBINDUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR ANLAGEN IN EINER FLUGZEUGPASSAGIERKABINE | [2007/44] | English: | ARRANGEMENT OF LINE CONNECTIONS FOR INSTALLATIONS IN AN AIRCRAFT PASSENGER CABIN | [2007/44] | French: | AGENCEMENT DE RACCORDEMENTS DE LIGNES DESTINE A DES INSTALLATIONS DANS LA CABINE PASSAGERS D'UN AERONEF | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 24.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | [2011/33] |
Former [2011/17] | SE | 29.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5083727 (POMPEI ARTURO [US], et al) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document * |