EP1859458 - A METHOD AND AN ARRAY FOR MAGNETIZING A MAGNETIZABLE OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NCTEngineering GmbH Erlenhof-Park, Inselkammerstrasse 10 82008 Unterhaching / DE | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAY, Lutz Wolfratshauser Str. 23a 82538 Gelting/Geretsried / DE | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Kopf, Korbinian Paul Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06707587.9 | 16.03.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006EP02424 | Priority number, date | EP20050005732 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: EP 05005732 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006097308 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1859458 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1859458 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01F13/00 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
H01F13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ARRAY ZUM MAGNETISIEREN EINES MAGNETISIERBAREN OBJEKTS | [2007/48] | English: | A METHOD AND AN ARRAY FOR MAGNETIZING A MAGNETIZABLE OBJECT | [2007/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET RÉSEAU D'AIMANTATION D'UN OBJET MAGNÉTISABLE | [2011/37] |
Former [2007/48] | PROCEDE ET RESEAU DE MAGNETISATION D'UN OBJET MAGNETISABLE | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2006 | AT | 15.02.2012 | BE | 15.02.2012 | CY | 15.02.2012 | CZ | 15.02.2012 | DK | 15.02.2012 | EE | 15.02.2012 | FI | 15.02.2012 | IT | 15.02.2012 | LT | 15.02.2012 | LV | 15.02.2012 | NL | 15.02.2012 | PL | 15.02.2012 | RO | 15.02.2012 | SE | 15.02.2012 | SI | 15.02.2012 | SK | 15.02.2012 | TR | 15.02.2012 | IE | 16.03.2012 | LU | 16.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | BG | 15.05.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | ES | 26.05.2012 | IS | 15.06.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 16.03.2012 | ||
LU | 16.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 16.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 16.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 16.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
IE | 16.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
LV | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
LT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 15.02.2012 | |
IS | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 15.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [YA]US4471403 (DRESS JR WILLIAM B [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,7,35,36 * claims 1,2,4-6 * * column 4, line 3 - line 6 * * figure - * [A] 1,9,12-15,17,18,23,24,27,29,33,34; | [YA]US4811609 (NISHIBE YUJI [JP], et al) [Y] 12,32,33 * claims 1,3,6,9,10,12,14 * * column 4, line 16 - line 32 * * figures 1,6 * [A] 1,7,13-15,17,18,23,27,29,34,36; | [A]EP1049115 (BRAILLON MAGNETIQUE [FR]) [A] 1,12-15,17,18,29-33 * claims 1,4,6 ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO0113081 (FAST TECHNOLOGY GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,5,8-10,23,25,27,29,31,34 * claims 1,4 * * page 16, line 10 - page 20, line 2 * * figures 8b,12 *; | [DXY]WO02063262 (FAST TECHNOLOGY AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1,4-6,8-11,23-25,27-31,34 * claims 1,2,4,5,7,9 * * page 3, line 14 - line 17 * * page 14, line 8 - page 16, line 10 * * figure 2 * [Y] 2,3,7,12,32,33,35,36 |