EP1850719 - TOASTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2011/04] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAMER, Siegmund Bachweg 5 83417 Kirchanschöring / DE | 02 /
SCHÖNFELDER, Thomas Hofweg 6a 83250 Marquartstein / DE | 03 /
STEFFL, Michael Hochplattenstr. 8 83250 Marquartstein / DE | [2007/45] | Application number, filing date | 06707958.2 | 01.02.2006 | [2007/45] | WO2006EP50596 | Priority number, date | DE20051006384 | 11.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005006384 | [2007/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006084814 | Date: | 17.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1850719 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1850719 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A47J37/08 | [2007/45] | CPC: |
A47J37/0835 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOASTER | [2007/45] | English: | TOASTER | [2007/45] | French: | GRILLE-PAIN | [2007/45] | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 28.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.01.2011 | CZ | 26.01.2011 | DK | 26.01.2011 | EE | 26.01.2011 | FI | 26.01.2011 | HU | 26.01.2011 | IE | 26.01.2011 | IT | 26.01.2011 | LT | 26.01.2011 | LV | 26.01.2011 | NL | 26.01.2011 | PL | 26.01.2011 | RO | 26.01.2011 | SE | 26.01.2011 | SI | 26.01.2011 | SK | 26.01.2011 | TR | 26.01.2011 | AT | 01.02.2011 | LU | 01.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | BG | 26.04.2011 | GR | 27.04.2011 | ES | 07.05.2011 | IS | 26.05.2011 | PT | 26.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
TR | 26.01.2011 | ||
AT | 01.02.2011 | ||
LU | 01.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
AT | 01.02.2011 | ||
LU | 01.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
AT | 01.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
IT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 26.01.2011 | |
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US1512122 (JOHN MARCEL) [X] 1 * page 1, line 73 - page 3, line 12; figures 1,2,7,8 *; | [X]CH258572 (NIEDERER EMILE [CH]) [X] 1* page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 3; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US2724322 (PARR BERNARD F) [X] 1-8,11,12 * column 1, line 26 - line 33 * * column 4, line 44 - column 5, line 74; figures 1,2,4 * [A] 9,10 |