EP1848734 - METHOD FOR COATING SURFACES WITH HYDROPHOBINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.12.2010 [2010/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUBKOWSKI, Thomas Wichernstr. 13 68526 Ladenburg / DE | 02 /
KAROS, Marvin Clementine-Bassermann-Str. 3 68723 Schwetzingen / DE | 03 /
BOLLSCHWEILER, Claus Karl-Christ-Str.13 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 04 /
BAUS, Ulf Im Hallgarten 6b 69221 Dossenheim / DE | 05 /
RÜDIGER, Patrick Moltkestrasse 43 67454 Hassloch / DE | 06 /
LANG, Michael Hildastrasse 5a 68535 Edingen-Neckarhausen / DE | 07 /
MONTAG, Thorsten Neissestr.1a 67574 Osthofen / DE | 08 /
BRANDT, Alexandra Röntgenstr. 16a 76870 Kandel / DE | [2007/44] | Application number, filing date | 06708070.5 | 07.02.2006 | [2007/44] | WO2006EP50723 | Priority number, date | DE20051005737 | 07.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005005737 | DE20051007480 | 17.02.2005 Original published format: DE102005007480 | DE20051051515 | 26.10.2005 Original published format: DE102005051515 | [2007/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006082253 | Date: | 10.08.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1848734 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/37 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
C07K14/37 (EP,US);
B05D5/04 (EP,US);
C03C17/28 (EP,US);
C07K14/195 (EP,US);
C07K17/00 (EP,US);
C14C13/00 (EP,US);
B05D2201/02 (EP,US);
B05D2202/25 (EP,US);
B05D2203/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BESCHICHTEN VON OBERFLÄCHEN MIT HYDROPHOBINEN | [2007/44] | English: | METHOD FOR COATING SURFACES WITH HYDROPHOBINS | [2007/44] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ENDUIRE DES SURFACES AVEC DES HYDROPHOBINES | [2007/44] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 07.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/52] | 10.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9641882 (PROEFSTATION VOOR DE CHAMPIGNO [NL], et al); | [XY]WO0157528 (APPLIED NANOSYSTEMS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5,6,10,11,13,14; | [XY] - JANSSEN M I ET AL, "Coating with genetic engineered hydrophobin promotes growth of fibroblasts on a hydrophobic solid", BIOMATERIALS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (200212), vol. 23, no. 24, ISSN 0142-9612, pages 4847 - 4854, XP004380887 [X] 1,3,4,7-9,12 * page 4850; table 1 * [Y] 2,5,6,10,11,13,14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0142-9612(02)00240-5 | [XY] - LINDER MARKUS ET AL, "Surface adhesion of fusion proteins containing the hydrophobins HFBI and HFBII from Trichoderma reesei", PROTEIN SCIENCE, (200209), vol. 11, no. 9, ISSN 0961-8368, pages 2257 - 2266, XP002386767 [X] 1,3,4,7-9,12 * the whole document * [Y] 2,5,6,10,11,13,14 | [Y] - ANANICHEV A V ET AL, "IMMOBILIZATION OF GLUCOSE ISOMERASE ON POROUS SILOCHROME IN VACUUM", PRIKLADNAYA BIOKHIMIYA I MIKROBIOLOGIYA, (1984), vol. 20, no. 4, ISSN 0555-1099, pages 458 - 463, XP001247329 [Y] 10,13 * the whole document * | [Y] - STRINGER M A ET AL, "DEWA ENCODES A FUNGAL HYDROPHOBIN COMPONENT OF THE ASPERGILLUS SPORE WALL", MOLECULAR MICROBIOLOGY, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC, OXFORD, GB, (1995), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 0950-382X, pages 33 - 44, XP000770242 [Y] 11,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2958.1995.tb02389.x | [ ] - UniProt, (19961001), Database accession no. P52750, URL: EBI, XP002386772 [ ] * column A * | [Y] - BELITSKY BORIS R, "Physical and enzymological interaction of Bacillus subtilis proteins required for de novo pyridoxal 5'-phosphate biosynthesis.", JOURNAL OF BACTERIOLOGY, (200402), vol. 186, no. 4, ISSN 0021-9193, pages 1191 - 1196, XP002386768 [Y] 11,14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JB.186.4.1191-1196.2004 | [ ] - UniProt, (19941001), Database accession no. P37527, URL: EBI, XP002386773 [ ] * column A * | [ ] - UniProt, (19941001), Database accession no. P37528, URL: EBI, XP002386774 [ ] * column A * | [A] - WOESTEN H A B, "HYDROPHOBINS: MULTIPURPOSE PROTEINS", ANNUAL REVIEW OF MICROBIOLOGY, ANNUAL REVIEWS INC., PALO ALTO, CA, US, (2001), vol. 55, ISSN 0066-4227, pages 625 - 646, XP008003420 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.micro.55.1.625 |